EP3455883 - HIGH ELECTRON MOBILITY TRANSISTOR (HEMT) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RFHIC Corporation RFHIC building, 41-14 Burim-ro, 170 beon-gil Gwanyang-dong Dongan-gu, Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do 14055 / KR | [2019/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Won Sang 1 Heather Ct Chapel Hill, North Carolina 27517 / US | [2019/17] |
Former [2019/12] | 01 /
LEE, Won Sang 4301 Drew Hill Ln Chapel Hill North Carolina 27514 / US | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/44] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2019/12] | Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 17796636.3 | 08.05.2017 | [2019/12] | WO2017US31581 | Priority number, date | US201662334837P | 11.05.2016 Original published format: US 201662334837 P | US201715588650 | 07.05.2017 Original published format: US201715588650 | [2019/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2017196740 | Date: | 16.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3455883 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3455883 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/778, H01L21/338, H01L29/417, H01L29/20, H01L23/48, H01L23/485, H01L21/768, // H01L29/41, H01L29/06 | [2021/28] | CPC: |
H01L21/76898 (EP,CN,US);
H01L29/7783 (CN,KR);
H01L29/404 (US);
H01L21/8232 (US);
H01L23/481 (EP,CN,US);
H01L24/05 (EP,US);
H01L27/0605 (US);
H01L27/085 (US);
H01L29/0619 (EP,US);
H01L29/2003 (EP,US);
H01L29/205 (US);
H01L29/401 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/402 (EP,CN,US);
H01L29/408 (US);
H01L29/4175 (EP,US);
H01L29/452 (KR);
H01L29/66462 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/7786 (EP,US);
H01L29/7787 (US);
H01L21/823481 (US);
H01L21/8252 (US);
H01L2224/0345 (EP,US);
H01L2224/03462 (EP,US);
H01L2224/04026 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05027 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05073 (EP,US);
H01L2224/0508 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05084 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05139 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05144 (EP);
H01L2224/05147 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05166 (EP);
H01L2224/0557 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05572 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05583 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05644 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29009 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29022 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29025 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29294 (EP,US);
H01L2224/293 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32245 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83191 (EP,US);
H01L2224/94 (EP,US);
H01L24/03 (EP,US);
H01L24/29 (EP,US);
H01L24/94 (EP,US);
H01L29/0657 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/0345, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/03462, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05084, H01L2224/05644, H01L2224/05639, H01L2224/05147, H01L2224/05144, H01L2224/05166 (EP,US);
H01L2224/0508, H01L2224/05644, H01L2224/05147, H01L2224/05644, H01L2224/05147, H01L2224/05144, H01L2224/05166 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05139, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/05144, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/05147, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/05166, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/05644, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/29294, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/293, H01L2924/014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/94, H01L2224/03 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2020/12] | H01L29/778, H01L21/338, H01L29/417, H01L29/20, H01L23/48, H01L21/768, // H01L29/41, H01L29/06 | ||
Former IPC [2019/52] | H01L29/778, H01L21/338, H01L29/20, H01L29/417, H01L23/48, H01L21/768, // H01L29/41, H01L29/06 | ||
Former IPC [2019/12] | H01L29/778, H01L29/66, H01L29/45 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRANSISTOR MIT HOHER ELEKTRONENMOBILITÄT (HEMT) | [2019/12] | English: | HIGH ELECTRON MOBILITY TRANSISTOR (HEMT) | [2019/12] | French: | TRANSISTOR À HAUTE MOBILITÉ ÉLECTRONIQUE (HEMT) | [2019/12] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/12] | 22.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.10.2021 | 21.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 06.10.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | EP21177502.8 / EP3905340 | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.05.2017 | AL | 03.11.2021 | AT | 03.11.2021 | CY | 03.11.2021 | CZ | 03.11.2021 | DK | 03.11.2021 | EE | 03.11.2021 | ES | 03.11.2021 | FI | 03.11.2021 | HR | 03.11.2021 | IT | 03.11.2021 | LT | 03.11.2021 | LV | 03.11.2021 | MC | 03.11.2021 | MK | 03.11.2021 | MT | 03.11.2021 | NL | 03.11.2021 | PL | 03.11.2021 | RO | 03.11.2021 | RS | 03.11.2021 | SE | 03.11.2021 | SI | 03.11.2021 | SK | 03.11.2021 | SM | 03.11.2021 | BG | 03.02.2022 | NO | 03.02.2022 | GR | 04.02.2022 | IS | 03.03.2022 | PT | 03.03.2022 | IE | 08.05.2022 | LU | 08.05.2022 | BE | 31.05.2022 | CH | 31.05.2022 | LI | 31.05.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 08.05.2017 | |
AL | 03.11.2021 | ||
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CY | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
IT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
MK | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
IE | 08.05.2022 | ||
LU | 08.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 08.05.2017 | |
AL | 03.11.2021 | ||
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CY | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
IT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
IE | 08.05.2022 | ||
LU | 08.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 08.05.2017 | |
AL | 03.11.2021 | ||
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
IT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
IE | 08.05.2022 | ||
LU | 08.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
IT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
IE | 08.05.2022 | ||
LU | 08.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
IE | 08.05.2022 | ||
LU | 08.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
LU | 08.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
LU | 08.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 03.02.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010295097 (TAKENAKA ISAO [JP], et al) [A] 4 * figures 2, 8 *; | [X]US2011140172 (CHU RONGMING [US], et al) [X] 9-15* figures 1, 2, 6, 7 and associated text *; | [XI]JP2013038239 (SANKEN ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1-3 * figures 2, 8 and associated text * [I] 4; | [XI]US2016035853 (KANEKO SAICHIROU [JP], et al) [X] 1,3 * figures 3, 6 and associated text * [I] 2,4 | International search | [A]JPH06244277 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0018]-[0025] and figures 1-2. *; | [A]US2002117681 (WEEKS T WARREN [US], et al) [A] 1-20* See paragraphs [0025]-[0060] and figures 1-8. *; | [A]US2008206974 (SIMIN GRIGORY [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0021]-[0037] and figures 1A-5D. *; | [XYA]JP2015220430 (SHARP KK) [X] 1-2, 4-5 * See paragraphs [0011]-[0036] and figures 1-3. * [Y] 6 [A] 3, 7-20; | [Y]US2016087074 (PRECHTL GERHARD [AT]) [Y] 6 * See paragraphs [0038]-[0061] and figures 1-4. *; | [A]WO2016054545 (UNIV FLORIDA [US]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0033]-[0041] and figures 1A-18. * |