EP3555541 - APPARATUS FOR DRYING GRANULATE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/43] | DEVICE FOR DRYING GRANULES | ||
[2020/29] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.04.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maag Automatik GmbH Ostring 19 63762 Großostheim / DE | [2019/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FISCHER, Florian Richardisweg 1 85560 Ebersberg / DE | 02 /
HELM, Alexander Danzigerstrasse 14 63500 Seligenstadt / DE | [2019/43] | Representative(s) | Thoma, Michael, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/43] | Spranger, Stephan Spranger + Burger Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 28 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17797049.8 | 16.10.2017 | [2019/43] | WO2017EP01213 | Priority number, date | DE20162006420U | 17.10.2016 Original published format: DE 202016006420 U | [2019/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018072871 | Date: | 26.04.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3555541 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F26B17/24, F26B5/08, B29B9/16 | [2019/43] | CPC: |
B29B13/06 (EP,KR,US);
F26B17/24 (EP,KR,US);
B29B9/16 (EP,KR,US);
F26B17/22 (EP,US);
F26B5/08 (EP,KR,US);
F26B2200/08 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/43] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR TROCKNUNG VON GRANULATKÖRNERN | [2019/43] | English: | APPARATUS FOR DRYING GRANULATE MATERIAL | [2020/29] | French: | APPAREIL POUR LE SÉCHAGE DE MATÉRIEL GRANULÉ | [2020/29] |
Former [2019/43] | DEVICE FOR DRYING GRANULES | ||
Former [2019/43] | DISPOSITIF POUR SÉCHER DES GRANULÉS | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/43] | 11.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/43] | 11.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/17] | 10.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/17] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 11.09.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 11.09.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.09.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 11.09.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 11.09.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.09.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 11.09.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 11.09.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.09.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2020 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US4565015 (HUNDLEY III RAYMOND E [US]) [I] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0536650 (KLEIN ALB GMBH CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [IDA]EP0653277 (WERNER & PFLEIDERER [DE]) [ID] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-12; | [IA]WO0023758 (GALA INC [US], et al) [I] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-12; | [A]EP1650516 (GALA INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US2008072447 (HEHENBERGER GERHARD [AT], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102007040135 (BKG BRUCKMANN & KREYENBORG GRANULIERTECHNIK GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [IA]US2013036625 (MUERB REINHARDT-KARSTEN [DE]) [I] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-12 | by applicant | EP0653277 | DE102007040135 |