EP3528659 - MIXING SYSTEM FOR PRODUCING A COSMETIC PRODUCT AND COSMETIC CAPSULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.04.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B2B Cosmetics 254 Ch. de la Farlede 83500 La Seyne sur Mer / FR | [2019/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROS, Julien 218 rue du Général Michel Audeoud 83000 Toulon / FR | 02 /
TUTENUIT, Grégoire 4B rue Lamothe Guérin 83000 Toulon / FR | [2019/35] | Representative(s) | Atout PI Laplace Immeuble Up On 25 Boulevard Romain Rolland CS 40072 75685 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/35] | Lefevre-Groboillot, David André Cabinet Weinstein 176 avenue Charles de Gaulle 92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR | Application number, filing date | 17797394.8 | 18.10.2017 | [2019/35] | WO2017FR52872 | Priority number, date | FR20160060218 | 21.10.2016 Original published format: FR 1660218 | [2019/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018073541 | Date: | 26.04.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3528659 | Date: | 28.08.2019 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A45D34/00, B01F13/00, B01F15/02 | [2019/35] | CPC: |
A45D34/00 (EP,KR,US);
B01F27/808 (EP,KR,US);
B01F23/41 (US);
B01F23/43 (US);
B01F27/91 (EP,KR);
B01F27/921 (US);
B01F35/21112 (US);
B01F35/2217 (US);
B01F35/7131 (EP,US);
B01F35/71805 (KR,US);
B01F35/92 (US);
A45D2034/002 (EP,KR);
A45D2034/005 (EP,KR,US);
A45D2200/056 (US);
A45D2200/058 (EP,US);
A45D2200/155 (US);
B01F2035/98 (US);
B01F2035/99 (US);
B01F2101/21 (KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/35] | Title | German: | MISCHSYSTEM ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KOSMETISCHEN PRODUKTS UND KOSMETIKKAPSEL | [2019/35] | English: | MIXING SYSTEM FOR PRODUCING A COSMETIC PRODUCT AND COSMETIC CAPSULE | [2019/35] | French: | SYSTEME MELANGEUR POUR FABRIQUER UN PRODUIT COSMETIQUE ET CAPSULE COSMETIQUE | [2019/35] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/35] | 17.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE8419884U ; | [X]WO9948802 (FOX TERRY S [US]); | [Y]EP1093842 (ESMORIS RODRIGUEZ MARIA JESUS [ES]); | [A]DE102006029345 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]); | [A]WO2013171621 (LAMEPLAST SPA [IT]); | [Y]FR2998193 (AC & B [FR]); | [A]FR3026622 (LABORATOIRES M&L [FR]); | [A]FR3027786 (FABRE JACQUES GERMAIN JEAN [FR]) |