EP3532832 - METHOD FOR NONDESTRUCTIVE INSPECTION BY ULTRASOUND OF A BONDED ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Safran 2 boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [2019/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUCOUSSO, Mathieu, Loïc SAFRAN AIRCRAFT ENGINES PI (AJI) Rond-Point René Ravaud - Réau 77550 Moissy-Cramayel / FR | 02 /
CUVILLIER, Nicolas SAFRAN AIRCRAFT ENGINES PI (AJI) Rond-Point René Ravaud - Réau 77550 Moissy-Cramayel / FR | [2019/36] | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [2022/50] |
Former [2019/36] | Gevers & Orès 41 avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 17797405.2 | 24.10.2017 | [2019/36] | WO2017FR52926 | Priority number, date | FR20160060355 | 25.10.2016 Original published format: FR 1660355 | [2019/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018078272 | Date: | 03.05.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3532832 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3532832 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/04, G01N29/26, G01N29/30, G01N29/44, G01N29/46, G01N29/52 | [2019/36] | CPC: |
G01N29/041 (EP,US);
G01N29/04 (RU);
G01N29/262 (EP,US);
G01N29/30 (EP,US);
G01N29/4409 (EP,US);
G01N29/4472 (US);
G01N29/46 (EP,US);
G01N29/52 (EP,US);
G01N2291/0231 (EP,US);
G01N2291/02854 (EP,US);
G01N2291/0427 (EP,US);
G01N2291/106 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ZERSTÖRUNGSFREIEN PRÜFUNG EINER VERKLEBTEN ANORDNUNG MITTELS ULTRASCHALL | [2019/36] | English: | METHOD FOR NONDESTRUCTIVE INSPECTION BY ULTRASOUND OF A BONDED ASSEMBLY | [2019/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE NON DESTRUCTIF PAR ULTRASONS D'UN ASSEMBLAGE COLLÉ | [2019/36] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/36] | 26.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 14.12.2022 | AT | 14.12.2022 | CZ | 14.12.2022 | DK | 14.12.2022 | EE | 14.12.2022 | ES | 14.12.2022 | FI | 14.12.2022 | HR | 14.12.2022 | IT | 14.12.2022 | LT | 14.12.2022 | LV | 14.12.2022 | MC | 14.12.2022 | NL | 14.12.2022 | PL | 14.12.2022 | RO | 14.12.2022 | RS | 14.12.2022 | SE | 14.12.2022 | SI | 14.12.2022 | SK | 14.12.2022 | SM | 14.12.2022 | NO | 14.03.2023 | GR | 15.03.2023 | IS | 14.04.2023 | PT | 14.04.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
IT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 14.12.2022 | |
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 14.12.2022 | |
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 14.12.2022 | |
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 14.12.2022 | |
NO | 14.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A] - CHO H ET AL, "Evaluation of the Thickness and Bond Quality of Three-Layered Media using Zero-Group-Velocity Lamb Waves", JOURNAL OF PHYSICS: CONFERENCE SERIES, INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS PUBLISHING, BRISTOL, GB, vol. 520, no. 1, doi:10.1088/1742-6596/520/1/012023, ISSN 1742-6596, (20140603), page 12023, (20140603), XP020265499 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/1742-6596/520/1/012023 | [A] - GESLAIN A ET AL, "Spatial Laplace transform for complex wavenumber recovery and its application to the analysis of attenuation in acoustic systems", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, US, vol. 120, no. 13, doi:10.1063/1.4963827, ISSN 0021-8979, (20161007), (20161007), XP012212491 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.4963827 | [A] - Claire Prada ET AL, "Remarkable properties of Lamb modes in plates Women in Applied Mathematics", (20110502), URL: http://acmac.uoc.gr/WAM2011/talks/Prada.pdf, (20170628), XP055386231 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | [A] - Dominique Clorennec ET AL, "Laser Generation and Detection of Zero-group Velocity Lamb Modes for Plate and Adhesive Disbond Characterization", 1st International Symposium on Laser Ultrasonics: Science, Technology and Applications, (20080716), URL: http://www.ndt.net/article/laser-ut2008/papers/Clorennec LU2008.pdf, (20170628), XP055386082 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | [A] - WU T-T ET AL, "Inverse determinations of thickness and elastic properties of a bonding layer using laser-generated surface waves", ULTRASONICS, IPC SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY PRESS LTD. GUILDFORD, GB, (19990101), vol. 37, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S0041-624X(98)00030-4, ISSN 0041-624X, pages 23 - 30, XP004154489 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0041-624X(98)00030-4 | by applicant | - CHO H. et al., Evaluation of the Thickness and Bond Quality of Three-Layered Media using Zero-Group-Velocity Lamb Waves | - GESLAIN A. et al., Spatial Laplace transform for complex wavenumber recovery and its application to the analysis of atténuation in acoustic systems |