EP3549236 - STATOR FOR AN ELECTRICAL MACHINE, A PRODUCTION METHOD, AND AN ELECTRICAL MACHINE FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | [2019/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FIPPL, Mike Rosebachstraße 4 34225 Baunatal / DE | 02 /
WETTERAU, Lars Ludwig-Erhard-Str. 34 B 34131 Kassel / DE | [2019/41] | Application number, filing date | 17798221.2 | 16.11.2017 | [2019/41] | WO2017EP79445 | Priority number, date | DE201610224066 | 02.12.2016 Original published format: DE102016224066 | [2019/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018099728 | Date: | 07.06.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3549236 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/18 | [2019/41] | CPC: |
H02K1/185 (EP);
H02K15/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/41] | Title | German: | STATOR FÜR EINE ELEKTRISCHE MASCHINE, HERSTELLVERFAHREN UND ELEKTRISCHE MASCHINE FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2019/41] | English: | STATOR FOR AN ELECTRICAL MACHINE, A PRODUCTION METHOD, AND AN ELECTRICAL MACHINE FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2019/41] | French: | STATOR POUR UNE MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ET MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE POUR UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2019/41] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/41] | 02.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/43] | 22.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE102012017293 (GETRAG GETRIEBE ZAHNRAD [DE]) [X] 1-4,10 * paragraphs [0112] , [0119] - [0121]; figures 4,6,12 *; | [X]EP2899849 (MEIDENSHA ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,10 * paragraph [0022]; figures 1-5 *; | [X]JP2013135539 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1-4,10 * paragraph [0032]; figures 1-8 *; | [X]US2012126641 (MURAKAMI SATOSHI [JP]) [X] 1-4,10 * figures 2,3 *; | [X]US2014091672 (YAMADA TOYONOBU [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,10 * figure 2 *; | [X]EP3035491 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,4,10 * paragraph [0064]; figures 7a,7b *; | [XY]US1771475 (WRIGHT EDWIN M) [X] 1-5,8,10 * the whole document * [Y] 6,7,9; | [Y]GB329739 (ERNEST BARLOW, et al) [Y] 6,7 * figure 9 *; | [Y]US6425176 (OZAWA MASARU [JP], et al) [Y] 9 * column 1, line 14 - line 30 *; | [XY]US1980026 (WOOD ALEXANDER P) [X] 1,2,5-8,10 * the whole document * [Y] 9; | [X]GB737825 (GEN ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,10 * page 1, line 79 - page 2, line 49; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US3807040 (OTTO C) [X] 1-3,5-8,10 * figures 1-4 * | by applicant | DE102008007578 | US6088905 | EP2887507 |