EP3458307 - FLUID LOAD STABILISER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carpenter, Bradley John 20 Ferrier Rd Narangba, Queensland 4504 / AU | [2019/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2019/13] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2023/26] |
Former [2019/13] | Walker, Ross Thomson Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17798409.3 | 19.05.2017 | [2019/13] | WO2017AU50470 | Priority number, date | AU20160901893 | 20.05.2016 Original published format: AU 2016901893 | [2019/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017197464 | Date: | 23.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3458307 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3458307 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 23.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60P3/24, B65D90/52, B65D88/12, B60K15/077, B60P3/22 | [2020/08] | CPC: |
B60P3/2235 (EP,US);
B60K15/077 (EP,RU,US);
B60P3/22 (RU);
B60P3/24 (EP,US);
B65D88/06 (RU);
B65D88/12 (RU);
B65D88/126 (EP,US);
B65D90/52 (EP,US);
B60K2015/0344 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/13] | B60P3/24, B65D90/52, B65D88/12, B60K15/077 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSBELASTUNGSSTABILISATOR | [2019/13] | English: | FLUID LOAD STABILISER | [2019/13] | French: | STABILISATEUR DE CHARGE DE FLUIDE | [2019/13] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 30.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/13] | 14.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 28.06.2023 | ES | 28.06.2023 | HR | 28.06.2023 | PL | 28.06.2023 | RO | 28.06.2023 | RS | 28.06.2023 | SK | 28.06.2023 | SM | 28.06.2023 | NO | 28.09.2023 | GR | 29.09.2023 | IS | 28.10.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 28.06.2023 | |
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | NO | 28.09.2023 | |
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | NO | 28.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4775070 (WILLIAMS JAMES [US]) [X] 1-5,7-15 * abstract * * column 3, lines 45-58 * * column 4, line 18 - column 5, line 18 * * figures 1,3-5 * [I] 6; | [XI]US6095367 (BLAIR MICHAEL D [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11-15 * abstract * * column 5, lines 51-62 * * column 6, line 37 - column 7, line 13 * * figures 3-7 * [I] 10; | [XI]DE202008000331U (SPEIDEL TANK UND BEHAELTERBAU [DE]) [X] 1-5,7,9,11-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0 30] - [0034] * * claims 1, 3 * * figures 1-4 * [I] 6,8,10; | [XI]US2012211496 (REA JAMES ROBERT [NZ]) [X] 1-5,7-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0117] - [0131] * * figures 1-3 *[I] 6; | [XI]GB2515558 (ARTICULATED TRUCK SOLUTIONS LLP [GB]) [X] 1-5,7-9,11,12,14,15 * abstract * * page 2, lines 1-17 * * page 5, line 21 - page 6, line 15 * * figures 1-3 * [I] 6,10 | International search | [A]GB1129681 (TAMPLIN NORMAN THOMAS) [A] 1-20 * Whole document particularly Figures 1-2. *; | [A]US4611724 (WATKINS ROBERT L [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * Figures 1-5; column 2, lines 4-63 *; | [A]JPH04260827 (NEC IBARAKI LTD) [A] 1-20* Whole document machine translation, particularly paragraphs [0009-0011] *; | [X]US5779092 (HEHN RONALD L [US], et al) [X] 1-13, 18-20 * Figures 1-9; column 4, line 66-column 6, line 60 *; | [X]US2002179611 (HAGENBUCH LEROY G [US]) [X] 1-5, 9-13, 18-20 * Figures 1-22; Paragraphs [0001], [0032], [0039-0040], *; | [X]AU2002302001 (ANAID NOMINEES PTY LTD [AU]) [X] 1-6, 8-9, 11-16, 18-20 * Figures 1-6; Page 3, line 29-Page 5, line 28 *; | [X]DE202008000331U (SPEIDEL TANK UND BEHAELTERBAU [DE]) [X] 1-7, 9, 11-13, 15, 16, 19, 20 * Figuresl-4; Paragraphs [0002], [0012], [0015-0016], [0030-0036] - machine translation *; | [X]EP2062834 (KAEFER ISOLIERTECHNIK [DE]) [X] 1-3, 5, 6, 8, 9, 11, 17 * Figure 1; Paragraphs [0012], [0023], [0026-0033] *; | [X]GB2515558 (ARTICULATED TRUCK SOLUTIONS LLP [GB]) [X] 1-9, 11-13, 18-20 * Figures 3a-3d; Page 5, line 22-Page 6, line 34 * | Examination | WO2013095954 | by applicant | US4775070 | US2012211496 | WO2013095954 |