EP3457978 - IMPLANT DESIGN AND COMPUTER ASSISTED SURGERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Think Surgical, Inc. 47201 Lakeview Blvd. Fremont, CA 94538 / US | [2019/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHALAYEV, Stan, G. 47201 Lakeview Blvd. Fremont, CA 94538 / US | 02 /
MUN, In, K. 47201 Lakeview Blvd. Fremont, CA 94538 / US | 03 /
FORSTEIN, Micah 47201 Lakeview Blvd. Fremont, CA 94538 / US | 04 /
KUZNIK, Kyle 47201 Lakeview Blvd. Fremont, CA 94538 / US | 05 /
PACK, Timothy 47201 Lakeview Blvd. Fremont, CA 94538 / US | [2019/13] | Representative(s) | Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB (Muc) Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/13] | Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17799875.4 | 08.05.2017 | [2019/13] | WO2017US31506 | Priority number, date | US201662336945P | 16.05.2016 Original published format: US 201662336945 P | [2019/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017200785 | Date: | 23.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3457978 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B34/10, G06T19/20 | [2019/51] | CPC: |
A61B34/10 (EP,US);
A61B17/86 (US);
A61B34/30 (EP,US);
A61F2/30734 (US);
A61F2/30942 (EP,US);
A61B17/8605 (EP,US);
A61B2034/102 (EP,US);
A61B2034/104 (EP,US);
A61B2034/105 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2055 (EP,US);
A61F2/34 (EP,US);
A61F2/38 (US);
A61F2/389 (EP,US);
A61F2/44 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30736 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/13] | A61B34/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/13] | Title | German: | IMPLANTATDESIGN UND COMPUTERGESTÜTZTE CHIRURGIE | [2019/13] | English: | IMPLANT DESIGN AND COMPUTER ASSISTED SURGERY | [2019/13] | French: | CONCEPTION D'IMPLANT ET CHIRURGIE ASSISTÉE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2019/13] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 13.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/13] | 05.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/34] | 26.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2024 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2010019463 (ARKEMA INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0034] , [0043]; claim 18 * [Y] 13-15; | [X]US8532806 (MASSON MARCOS V [US]) [X] 1* figures 1-8 *; | [XY]WO2013170872 (MOBELIFE N V [BE], et al) [X] 1-12 * page 1, line 4 - line 7 * * page 7, line 13 - line 20 * * page 20, line 16 - line 33 * * page 22, line 19 - page 23, line 8 * * figures 6,7 * [Y] 13-15; | [X]US2015119987 (DAVIGNON ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0041]; figure 1 * | International search | [XY]KR20120092451 (KOREA INST SCI & TECH [KR]) [X] 1, 4-13, 15-17 * See paragraphs [0027]-[0052]; claims 1-6; figures 1-6. * [Y] 2, 3; | [Y]US2015119987 (DAVIGNON ROBERT [US], et al) [Y] 2, 3 * See paragraphs [0021]-[0053]; claims 1-20; figures 1-4. *; | [A]US9089380 (SUTTIN ZACHARY B [US], et al) [A] 1-13, 15-17 * See the whole document. *; | [A]US8234097 (STEINES DANIEL [US], et al) [A] 1-13, 15-17 * See the whole document. *; | [A]WO2010019463 (ARKEMA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-13, 15-17 * See the whole document. * | by applicant | WO2013170872 | WO2010019463 |