EP3458086 - SYNTHETIC MALARIA IMMUNOGENS, COMBINATIONS THEREOF, AND THEIR USE TO PREVENT AND TREAT MALARIA INFECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Trustees of The University of Pennsylvania 3160 Chestnut Street Suite 200 Philadelphia, PA 19104 / US | For all designated states The Wistar Institute Of Anatomy And Biology 3601 Spruce Street Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19104 / US | For all designated states Inovio Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 660 W. Germantown Pike Suite 110 Plymouth Meeting, PA 19462 / US | For all designated states ALY, Ahmed, S.I. 1324 Tulane Avenue New Orleans, LA 70112 / US | [2019/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REUSCHEL, Emma 4411 Pine Street Apt. 2R Philadelphia, PA 19104 / US | 02 /
FERRARO, Bernadette 8594 Villa Jolla Drive, 376 La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | 03 /
ALY, Ahmed, S.I. 1324 Tulane Avenue New Orleans, LA 70112 / US | 04 /
WEINER, David 717 Beacom Lane Merion, PA 19066 / US | [2019/13] | Representative(s) | Leonard, Thomas Charles, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2019/13] | Application number, filing date | 17800274.7 | 19.05.2017 | [2019/13] | WO2017US33617 | Priority number, date | US201662338841P | 19.05.2016 Original published format: US 201662338841 P | [2019/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017201454 | Date: | 23.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3458086 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, A61K39/002, A61K39/015, C07K14/445, C12N15/30 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
A61K39/015 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/208 (KR);
A61K38/2086 (KR);
A61P33/06 (EP,KR,US);
C07K14/445 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/53 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/54 (KR);
A61K2039/55527 (US);
A61K2039/55538 (US);
C07K2319/02 (EP,US);
C07K2319/20 (EP);
C07K2319/42 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/13] | Title | German: | SYNTHETISCHE MALARIA-IMMUNOGENE, KOMBINATIONEN DARAUS UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ZUR VORBEUGUNG UND BEHANDLUNG VON MALARIAINFEKTIONEN | [2019/13] | English: | SYNTHETIC MALARIA IMMUNOGENS, COMBINATIONS THEREOF, AND THEIR USE TO PREVENT AND TREAT MALARIA INFECTIONS | [2019/13] | French: | IMMUNOGÈNES SYNTHÉTIQUES DU PALUDISME, COMBINAISONS DE CEUX-CI ET LEUR UTILISATION POUR PRÉVENIR ET TRAITER LES INFECTIONS MALARIQUES | [2019/13] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/13] | 29.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/26] | 16.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5814617 (HOFFMAN STEPHEN L [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-10,12 * examples 3,4; claims 1,10 * [Y] 4,11; | [XY]EP2385107 (PASTEUR INSTITUT [FR]) [X] 1-3,5-10,12 * figures 6-8,13,14; claims 3,5,14 * [Y] 4,11; | [A]WO2015052543 (ISIS INNOVATION [GB], et al) [A] 1* SeqIdNo.3; SeqIdNo.6; Section 1.2.1;; tables 2.1,2.2 *; | [ ] - "Part of Plasomodium yoelii PyHEP17 protein.", Geneseq, (19981126), Database accession no. AAW71319, URL: EBI, XP002796583 [ ] * sequence . * | [Y] - "CS protein consensus-IgE expression construct, SEQ 14.", Geneseq, (20120524), Database accession no. AZV16553, URL: EBI, XP002796584 [Y] 4,11 * sequence . * | [ ] - "Synthetic construct DNA encoded protein SEQ:39.", Geneseq, (20111222), Database accession no. AZP30731, URL: EBI, XP002796585 [ ] * sequence . * | International search | [A]US2010183590 (DRUILHE PIERRE [FR], et al) [A] 1, 2, 5, 6, 28, 31, 32, 46 * entire document *; | [Y]US2011229514 (DOOLAN DENISE [AU], et al) [Y] 46 * entire document *; | [A]WO2013082394 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [A] 1, 2, 5, 6, 28, 31, 32, 46* entire document *; | [A]US8765145 (DRUILHE PIERRE [FR], et al) [A] 1, 2, 5, 6, 28, 31, 32, 46 * entire document *; | [XY]WO2015052543 (ISIS INNOVATION [GB], et al) [X] 1, 2, 28 * entire document * [Y] 46 |