|
05.09.2024 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.08.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2024 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.08.2024 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.08.2024 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.2024 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2024 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.2024 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.07.2024 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2024 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
03.07.2024 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
04.08.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2023 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.2023 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.05.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2023 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.01.2023 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2022 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.10.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.10.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.05.2021 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2019 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2019 |
Change to the inventor details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.2019 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.2019 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.06.2019 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
05.04.2019 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.06.2018 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
31.05.2018 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.05.2018 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
05.02.2018 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
30.11.2017 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
16.11.2017 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
16.11.2017 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
16.11.2017 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
10 |
|
16.11.2017 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
16.11.2017 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
4 |