EP3545190 - A METHOD OF CONTROLLING A WIND TURBINE, A CONTROLLER FOR A WIND TURBINE AND A WIND TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.07.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vestas Wind Systems A/S Hedeager 42 8200 Aarhus N / DK | [2019/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ØSTERGAARD, Kasper Zinck Buen 17 8762 Flemming / DK | 02 /
MONJO, Gustavo Avenida Chile España 485 Dpto 1003 Santiago 7770237 / CL | 03 /
KJÆR, Martin Ansbjerg Grønhøjvej 40 8462 Harlev J / DK | [2019/40] | Representative(s) | Vestas Patents Department Hedeager 42 8200 Aarhus N / DK | [2019/40] | Application number, filing date | 17800382.8 | 13.11.2017 | [2019/40] | WO2017DK50371 | Priority number, date | DK2016PA70939 | 25.11.2016 Original published format: DK PA201670939 | [2019/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018095493 | Date: | 31.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3545190 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3545190 | Date: | 02.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F03D7/04, F03D7/02, H02J3/38 | [2019/40] | CPC: |
F03D7/048 (EP,US);
F03D7/0284 (EP);
G05B15/02 (US);
H02J3/381 (EP,US);
H02J3/46 (EP,US);
H02J3/48 (EP,US);
F05B2270/337 (EP,US);
H02J2300/28 (EP,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP);
Y02E10/76 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER WINDTURBINE, STEUERGERÄT FÜR EINE WINDTURBINE SOWIE WINDTURBINE | [2019/40] | English: | A METHOD OF CONTROLLING A WIND TURBINE, A CONTROLLER FOR A WIND TURBINE AND A WIND TURBINE | [2019/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UNE ÉOLIENNE, DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE POUR UNE ÉOLIENNE ET ÉOLIENNE | [2019/40] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/40] | 19.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1467463 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [Y]EP2082132 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK]); | [XY]US2011012352 (NELSON ROBERT J [US], et al); | [X]US2011031748 (ARINAGA SHINJI [JP], et al); | [X]US2013187385 (WAKASA TSUYOSHI [JP], et al); | [XI]EP2884096 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); |