EP3535728 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR AUTOMATED TRAFFIC AND DRIVING PATTERN RECOGNITION AND LOCATION-DEPENDENT MEASUREMENT OF ABSOLUTE AND/OR RELATIVE RISK PROBABILITIES FOR CAR ACCIDENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.01.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Swiss Reinsurance Company Ltd. Mythenquai 50/60 8022 Zürich / CH | [2019/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGEL, Uwe Hugostrasse 9 8050 Zürich / CH | 02 /
VENKATESWARAN, Ramya Lärchenstrasse 6m 8953 Dietikon / CH | 03 /
LARKIN, Peter Alte Hedingerstrasse 44b 8910 Affoltern am Albis / CH | 04 /
ELSASSER, Christian Meilistrasse 1 8400 Winterthur / CH | 05 /
CHATZIPRODROMOU, Iordanis Alfred-Escher Strasse 86 8002 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2019/37] | 01 /
NAGEL, Uwe Hugostrasse 9 8050 Zürich / CH | ||
02 /
VENKATESWARAN, Ramya Lärchenstrasse 6m 8953 Dietikon / CH | |||
03 /
LARKIN, Peter Albisstrasse 118 8038 Zürich / CH | |||
04 /
ELSASSER, Christian Meilistrasse 1 8400 Winterthur / CH | |||
05 /
CHATZIPRODROMOU, Iordanis Alfred-Escher Strasse 86 8002 Zürich / CH | Representative(s) | Leimgruber, Fabian Alfred Rupert ThomannFischer Elisabethenstrasse 30 4010 Basel / CH | [2019/37] | Application number, filing date | 17800471.9 | 07.11.2017 | [2019/37] | WO2017EP78510 | Priority number, date | WO2016EP76783 | 07.11.2016 Original published format: PCT/EP2016/076783 | [2019/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018083352 | Date: | 11.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3535728 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q40/08 | [2019/37] | CPC: |
G06Q40/08 (EP,CH,US);
B60W30/0956 (US);
B60W40/04 (US);
B60W40/06 (US);
B60W40/09 (US);
G08G1/0112 (US);
G08G1/0116 (US);
G08G1/012 (US);
G08G1/0129 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/37] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUTOMATISIERTEN VERKEHRS- UND FAHRMUSTERERKENNUNG UND STANDORTABHÄNGIGEN MESSUNG VON ABSOLUTEN UND/ODER RELATIVEN RISIKOWAHRSCHEINLICHKEITEN FÜR AUTOUNFÄLLE | [2019/37] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR AUTOMATED TRAFFIC AND DRIVING PATTERN RECOGNITION AND LOCATION-DEPENDENT MEASUREMENT OF ABSOLUTE AND/OR RELATIVE RISK PROBABILITIES FOR CAR ACCIDENTS | [2019/37] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE RECONNAISSANCE DE MODÈLE DE TRAFIC ET DE CONDUITE AUTOMATISÉE ET DE MESURE DÉPENDANTE DE L'EMPLACEMENT DE PROBABILITÉS DE RISQUE ABSOLU ET/OU RELATIF D'ACCIDENTS DE VOITURE | [2019/37] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/37] | 07.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2014365246 (HAYWARD GREGORY [US], et al) | by applicant | US2014365246 |