EP3539019 - DYNAMIC INSIGHT OBJECTS FOR USER APPLICATION DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2021/45] |
Former [2019/38] | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELLIS, Charles David MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
FORTIER, Dominique MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
XUE, Liyin MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
NIELSEN, Jakob Peter MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 05 /
OTERO, Carlos Augusto MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 06 /
BHOJAWALA, Safiya MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 07 /
NEYLAN, Catherine William MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2019/38] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2019/38] | Application number, filing date | 17800675.5 | 03.11.2017 | [2019/38] | WO2017US59814 | Priority number, date | US201662418974P | 08.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662418974 P | US201715486968 | 13.04.2017 Original published format: US201715486968 | [2019/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018089255 | Date: | 17.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3539019 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2019/38] | CPC: |
G06T11/206 (EP,US);
G06F3/0482 (US);
G06F16/248 (US);
G06F16/9535 (EP,US);
G06F16/9577 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/38] | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHE EINSICHTOBJEKTE FÜR BENUTZERANWENDUNGSDATEN | [2019/38] | English: | DYNAMIC INSIGHT OBJECTS FOR USER APPLICATION DATA | [2019/38] | French: | OBJETS D'APERÇU DYNAMIQUE POUR DONNÉES D'APPLICATION D'UTILISATEUR | [2019/38] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/38] | 30.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/44] | 23.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2015088851 (DESHPANDE SUYOG ANIL [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0026] - [0029] - [0 31] , [0 33] , [0 55] , [0 56] , [0 58] , [ 787] , [ 110] , [ 112] , [ 128] , [ 133] * * figures 3C, 3D * * claim 1 *; | [A] - Susan Harkins, "Two ways to build dynamic charts in Excel - TechRepublic", (20130814), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20130814134009/https://www.techrepublic.com/blog/microsoft-office/two-ways-to-build-dynamic-charts-in-excel/, (20180105), XP055438547 [A] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 2 * |