EP3532103 - LIPID NANOPARTICLE FORMULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.03.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acuitas Therapeutics, Inc. 6190 Agronomy Road Suite 402 University of British Columbia - KETR Vancouver, British Columbia V6T 1W5 / CA | [2019/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOPE, Michael, J. 3550 West 11th Avenue Vancouver British Columbia V6R 2K2 / CA | 02 /
MUI, Barbara 1158 East 11th Avenue Vancouver British Columbia V5T 2G3 / CA | 03 /
LIN, Paulo, Jia Ching 2837 E. 54th Avenue Vancouver British Columbia V5S 1Y4 / CA | 04 /
BARBOSA, Christopher 925 Jarvis Street Coquitlam British Columbia V3J 4Z8 / CA | 05 /
MADDEN, Thomas 6190 Agronomy Road Suite 402 University of British Columbia - KETR Vancouver British Columbia V6T 1W5 / CA | 06 /
ANSELL, Steven, M. 201 - 2010 West 8th Avenue Vancouver British Columbia V6J 1W5 / CA | 07 /
DU, Xinyao 9580 Snowdon Avenue Richmond British Columbia V7A 2M1 / CA | [2019/36] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2019/36] | Application number, filing date | 17800986.6 | 26.10.2017 | [2019/36] | WO2017US58619 | Priority number, date | US201662413319P | 26.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662413319 P | US201615337434 | 28.10.2016 Original published format: US201615337434 | US201762485833P | 14.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762485833 P | US201762485836P | 14.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762485836 P | [2019/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018081480 | Date: | 03.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3532103 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/18, A61K47/22, A61K9/127, A61K31/7105 | [2019/36] | CPC: |
A61K9/1272 (EP);
A61K31/7105 (EP);
A61K47/18 (EP);
A61K47/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/36] | Title | German: | LIPIDNANOPARTIKELFORMULIERUNG | [2019/36] | English: | LIPID NANOPARTICLE FORMULATIONS | [2019/36] | French: | FORMULATIONS DE NANOPARTICULES LIPIDIQUES | [2019/36] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/36] | 14.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2024 | Observations by third parties | 17.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2024 | Observations by third parties | 01.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2010088537 (ALNYLAM PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2015130584 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al); | [XD]WO2015199952 (ACUITAS THERAPEUTICS INC [CA]); | [X]WO2016010840 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | [XP]WO2016176330 (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US], et al); | [XDP]WO2017075531 (ACUITAS THERAPEUTICS INC [CA]); | [XP]WO2017117528 (ACUITAS THERAPEUTICS INC [CA]); | [E]WO2017194454 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE]) | by applicant | WO9909076 | WO9939741 | US5965542 | WO0107548 | US6197553 | US2004142025 | US2005017054 | US2005064595 | US2005118253 | US2005175682 | US2006008910 | US2006083780 | US2006240093 | US2007042031 | US2010130588 | US2011060032 | US2011076335 | US2011091525 | US2011117125 | US2011216622 | US2011262527 | WO2011141705 | US2011311583 | US2011311582 | US2012027803 | WO2012016184 | US2012058188 | US2012172411 | US2012183581 | US2012251618 | US2012276209 | US2012295832 | US2013017223 | US2013022649 | WO2013016058 | US2013086373 | US2013123338 | WO2013086373 | WO2013086322 | US2013195920 | US2013245107 | US8569256 | US2013323269 | US2013338210 | WO2014008334 | US2014200257 | US2014308304 | US2015005363 | US2015203446 | US2015265708 | US2015273068 | WO2015199952 | US2015376115 | US2016009637 | US2016199485 | US2016376224 | WO2017004143 | WO2017075531 | other | WO2014136086 | WO2016071857 |