EP3464523 - METHOD FOR FORMING A SOLID FUEL ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/15] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR FORMING A SOLID FUEL ELEMENT | ||
[2023/19] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LT, NO | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ERS Fuel Inc. 2849 Road 119 RR7 St. Marys, Ontario N4X 1C9 / CA | [2019/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMALL, John Mark 85 Galt Road Stratford Ontario N5A 7S6 / CA | 02 /
BIRD, Douglas Robert 1 Freman Drive Buntingford Hertfordshire SG9 9TD / GB | 03 /
BIRD, James Douglas 30 Trinity Road Stamford Lincolnshire PE9 1BP / GB | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/02] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2019/15] | Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | Application number, filing date | 17801878.4 | 26.05.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017CA50641 | Priority number, date | US201662341798P | 26.05.2016 Original published format: US 201662341798 P | [2019/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017201628 | Date: | 30.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3464523 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3464523 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 30.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C10L5/44, C10L5/14, C10L5/40, B30B11/00, C10L5/36, B30B11/26 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
C10L5/442 (EP,US);
C10L5/14 (EP,US);
B30B11/265 (EP);
C10L5/146 (US);
C10L5/365 (EP,US);
C10L5/403 (EP);
C10L5/445 (EP);
C10L2250/06 (EP,US);
C10L2290/06 (EP,US);
C10L2290/24 (EP,US);
C10L2290/30 (EP,US);
C10L2290/50 (EP,US);
C10L2290/52 (EP,US);
C10L2290/58 (EP,US);
C10L2290/60 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/03] | C10L5/44, C10L5/14, C10L5/40, B30B11/00, C10L5/36 | ||
Former IPC [2019/15] | C10L5/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR FORMUNG EINES FESTEN BRENNSTOFFELEMENTS | [2023/19] | English: | METHOD FOR FORMING A SOLID FUEL ELEMENT | [2023/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION D'UN ÉLÉMENT COMBUSTIBLE SOLIDE | [2023/19] |
Former [2019/15] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR FORMUNG EINES FESTEN BRENNSTOFFELEMENTS | ||
Former [2019/15] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR FORMING A SOLID FUEL ELEMENT | ||
Former [2019/15] | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION D'UN ÉLÉMENT COMBUSTIBLE SOLIDE | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 15.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LT | 10.01.2024 | NL | 10.01.2024 | NO | 10.04.2024 | IS | 10.05.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/32] | NL | 10.01.2024 | |
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 10.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]AU2003246075 (RECYCLED FUELS PTY LTD [AU]) [I] 8-12 * figures 1-2; claims 1-3, 15 *; | [X]EP2508263 (XYLECO INC [US]) [X] 13-15 * paragraph [0151]; figure 20C; claims 1, 4-8, 11-12, 15 *; | [A]US2013319261 (KELLY JOHN T [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0002] , [0 43] - [0044] - [0 59] , [0 61]; claim 1 * | International search | [X]GB397568 (THOMAS AUGUSTUS GOSKAR) [X] 19-21* whole document *; | [X]US1990631 (BOWLING ROBERT T) [X] 1-18, 22-23 * whole document * | by applicant | US1990631 | AU2003246075 |