EP3447974 - DATA FORWARDING METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.11.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHONG, Qiwen Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Xiaojun Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
XU, Xiaofei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/09] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2019/09] | Application number, filing date | 17802004.6 | 18.04.2017 | [2019/09] | WO2017CN80893 | Priority number, date | CN201610368270 | 27.05.2016 Original published format: CN201610368270 | [2019/09] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017202158 | Date: | 30.11.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3447974 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/16, H04L12/729 | [2019/14] | CPC: |
H04J3/1658 (EP,US);
H04L45/125 (CN,US);
H04L45/121 (CN,US);
H04L7/041 (US);
H04Q11/0005 (CN);
H04J2203/0085 (EP,US);
H04L2007/045 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/09] | H04L12/729 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/09] | Title | German: | DATENWEITERLEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2019/09] | English: | DATA FORWARDING METHOD AND DEVICE | [2019/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSFERT DE DONNÉES | [2019/09] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2018 | Translation filed | 23.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 23.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/09] | 27.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US9231721 (VARADARAJAN BADRI [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-14 * column 1, line 9 - line 12 * * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 35 * * column 4, line 18 - column 5, line 45; figures 6,7,8,9,10,11 * * column 7, line 21 - line 28 * * column 7, line 44 - column 9, line 2; figures 12,13 * * column 11, line 39 - column 12, line 2; figure 17 * [I] 7,15; | [XI]US2007211750 (LI JIANCHANG [CN], et al) [X] 1-6,8-14 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0087]; figures 6,7 * [I] 7,15; | [A]US7869468 (GIANNAKOPOULOS DIMITRIOS [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 15 - line 19 * * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 5 * * column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 65; figure 1 *; | [A]US2007268931 (SHAIKLI NADIM [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0029]; figure 1A * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0066]; figure 2 * | [XI] - MAARTEN VISSERS HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO ET AL, "Considerations on the mapping of FlexE Client and Subrate signals into OTN;C 1195", ITU-T DRAFT ; STUDY PERIOD 2013-2016, INTERNATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATION UNION, GENEVA ; CH, (20150608), vol. 11/15, pages 1 - 13, XP044136869 [X] 1,9 * sections 2 to 4.3;; figures 1,2,3,4 * [I] 2-8,10-15 | International search | [Y]CN105227453 (CHINA UNICOM) [Y] 1-20 * description, paragraph [0042] *; | [Y]CN101631064 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-20 * description, page 8, line 19 to page 10, line 15 *; | [A]WO2014187371 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]CN102025445 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * |