EP3467147 - RESIN SUBSTRATE WITH COATING, PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR, AND COATING FORMATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YKK Corporation 1 Kandaizumi-Cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8642 / JP | [2019/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABE, Takuya c/o YKK CORPORATION Kurobe 200 Yoshida Kurobe-shi Toyama 938-8601 / JP | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Long, Giorgio Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | [2019/15] | Application number, filing date | 17802369.3 | 22.02.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017JP06649 | Priority number, date | WO2016JP65635 | 26.05.2016 Original published format: PCT/JP2016/065635 | [2019/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017203767 | Date: | 30.11.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3467147 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C23C18/22, B05D3/04, B05D3/10, B05D7/02, B32B5/28, C25D5/56, C25D7/02, A44B19/00, C08J7/04, C23C18/18, C23C18/20, C23C18/24, C23C18/38, // C23C18/16, C23C18/28, C23C18/30 | [2020/05] | CPC: |
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
B05D3/04 (EP,US);
B05D3/0446 (US);
B05D3/10 (EP,US);
B05D7/02 (EP,US);
B32B5/28 (EP,US);
C08J5/043 (US);
C23C18/1641 (US);
C23C18/1851 (EP);
C23C18/2006 (EP);
C23C18/22 (US);
C23C18/24 (EP);
C23C18/38 (EP);
C25D5/56 (US);
C25D7/02 (EP,US);
A44B19/26 (EP);
B05D2201/02 (US);
B05D2350/35 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/15] | C23C18/22, B05D3/04, B05D3/10, B05D7/02, B32B5/28, C25D5/56, C25D7/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Title | German: | HARZSUBSTRAT MIT BESCHICHTUNG, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND BESCHICHTUNGSBILDUNGSVERFAHREN | [2019/15] | English: | RESIN SUBSTRATE WITH COATING, PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR, AND COATING FORMATION METHOD | [2019/15] | French: | SUBSTRAT EN RÉSINE AVEC REVÊTEMENT, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION ET PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION DE REVÊTEMENT | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2018 | Translation filed | 04.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 04.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 28.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5206073 (SUZUKI YOSHIHARU [JP]) [X] 7,8,11,12 * abstract ** example 13; table 1 *; | [XI]FR2719604 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [X] 1-4,6-8,11,12,15 * abstract * * page 2, lines 21-27 * * page 4, line 32 - page 5, line 33 * * claims 1-7 * [I] 5,9,10 | International search | [Y]JPS57149463 (OKUNO CHEM IND CO) [Y] 1-19 * , claims; page 3, upper right column, lines 6 to 7; example 1 (Family: none) *; | [XYA]JPS621479 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY) [X] 11-14, 16-17 * , claims; page 1, lower left column, lines 17 to 19; page 2, upper right column, line 1 to page 3, upper left column, line 17 (Family: none) * [Y] 18 [A] 1-10, 15, 19; | [Y]JPS63103077 (MITSUBISHI METAL CORP) [Y] 1-19 * , page 1, lower right column, line 19 to page 2, upper right column, line 15 (Family: none) *; | [XA]JPH0299170 (POLYPLASTICS CO) [X] 11-16 * , page 2, upper right column, line 12 to lower left column, line 3; page 3, lower left column, lines 13 to 17; example 17 & US 5135773 A column 1, line 60 to column 2, line 11; column 4, lines 20 to 24 & US 5206073 A & EP 363103 A2 & MX 170036 B & BR 8905016 A & CA 1333679 A & KR 10-1991-0009219 B & CN 1042167 A *[A] 1-10, 17-19; | [XYA]JP2008024959 (KAYABA INDUSTRY CO LTD) [X] 11-12, 15-17 * , claims; paragraphs [0019], [0037]; fig. 1 (Family: none) * [Y] 18 [A] 1-10, 13-14, 19; | [Y]WO2013098978 (YKK CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-19 * , paragraphs [0005], [0009], [0020], [0023] & US 2015/0017458 A1 paragraphs [0005], [0009], [0020], [0023] & TW 201340903 A & CN 103997927 A * | by applicant | JPS5824310B | JPH0676668B | JP5474626B |