EP3466677 - DECORATIVE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toppan Printing Co., Ltd. 5-1, Taito 1-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0016 / JP | [2019/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIGASHIKAWA Eiichi c/o TOPPAN PRINTING CO. LTD. 5-1 Taito 1-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0016 / JP | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2019/15] | Application number, filing date | 17802947.6 | 26.05.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017JP19815 | Priority number, date | JP20160105260 | 26.05.2016 Original published format: JP 2016105260 | [2019/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017204361 | Date: | 30.11.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3466677 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/00, B32B3/10, B32B27/20, E04F13/08, D21H19/40, B44C5/04, B44F9/02, D21H19/82, D21H21/52, D21H27/18 | [2019/50] | CPC: |
B44C3/02 (EP);
B44D5/00 (KR);
B32B3/10 (EP,US);
B05D5/061 (KR);
B05D7/24 (KR);
B05D7/56 (KR);
B32B27/00 (EP,US);
B32B27/20 (EP,US);
B44C5/04 (EP,KR);
B44F1/02 (EP);
B44F7/00 (KR);
C09D7/42 (KR);
C09D7/61 (KR);
C09D7/69 (KR);
D21H19/40 (EP);
D21H19/82 (EP);
D21H19/822 (EP);
D21H21/52 (EP);
D21H27/18 (EP);
E04F13/08 (EP);
B32B27/40 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/15] | B32B27/00, B32B3/10, B32B27/20, E04F13/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Title | German: | DEKORATIVES MATERIAL | [2019/15] | English: | DECORATIVE MATERIAL | [2019/15] | French: | MATÉRIAU DÉCORATIF | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2018 | Translation filed | 02.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 03.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2005042373 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1,4-8 * figure 1; example 1 *; | [X]EP2298526 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3-8 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0054] ** figure 1 *; | [X]JP2014188744 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1 * figures 1,2; example 1 * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0090] *; | [X]JP2015182353 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1-8 * figures 1,2; example 1; table 1 * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0037] * | International search | [XY]JPH08300595 (NISSHA PRINTING) [X] 1, 4-8 * , entire text; particularly, claims; paragraphs [0006] to [0023]; fig. 2, 3, 6 to 8 (Family: none) * [Y] 3; | [XY]JP2001138470 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1, 2, 4, 5, 7, 8 * , entire text; particularly, claims; paragraphs [0037] to [0043], [0051] to [0059] (Family: none) * [Y] 3; | [XY]JP2014069446 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1, 2, 4, 5, 7, 8 * , entire text; particularly, claims; paragraphs [0044] to [0067], [0134] to [0145] (Family: none) * [Y] 3; | [A]JP2001315286 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * , entire text; particularly, claims; paragraphs [0020] to [0049]; fig. 1 to 4 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2008087269 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * , entire text; particularly, claims; paragraphs [0024] to [0031], [0036] to [0039]; fig. 1 & US 2010/0009135 A1 claims; paragraphs [0064] to [0075]; examples & WO 2008/038703 A1 & EP 2067616 A1 *; | [PA]JP2017065261 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [PA] 1-8 * , entire text; particularly, claims; paragraphs [0029] to [0045], [0089] to [0119]; fig. 1 (Family: none) * |