|
02.06.2023 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2022 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2022 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.06.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2022 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.06.2022 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.06.2022 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.02.2022 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.02.2022 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.02.2022 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2022 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
84 |
|
25.02.2022 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
85 |
|
20.01.2022 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2022 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2022 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2022 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2021 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings - with annex |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.12.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.12.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.12.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.12.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.12.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.12.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.12.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2021 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
10.12.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2021 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.09.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
13.09.2021 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.12.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.12.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2020 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.07.2020 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2020 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.01.2020 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2019 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2019 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.12.2019 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2019 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2019 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2019 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.07.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.07.2019 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2019 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2019 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.01.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2018 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.12.2018 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
08.10.2018 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.12.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
73 |
|
30.11.2017 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2017 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
87 |