Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12032110 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2024 | B2 | US2019293815 | 26.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662341446 | 25.05.2016 | WO2017US33898 | 23.05.2017 | US201716304356 | 23.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3025508 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662341446 | 25.05.2016 | WO2017US33898 | 23.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3465286 | Global Dossier | 27.07.2022 | B1 | EP3465286 | 15.01.2020 | A4 | EP3465286 | 10.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662341446 | 25.05.2016 | WO2017US33898 | 23.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3465286T | 31.10.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201662341446 | 25.05.2016 | WO2017US33898 | 23.05.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017205307 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662341446 | 25.05.2016 |