EP3533135 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONNECTING SHEET METAL TO A SHEET PACKAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/36] | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONNECTING LAMINATION PARTS TO FORM A LAMINATION STACK | ||
[2022/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states voestalpine Automotive Components Dettingen GmbH & Co. KG Daimlerstraße 29 72581 Dettingen an der Erms / DE | [2019/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURSY, Heinrich Zapfenäckerstrasse 16 73268 Erkenbrechtsweiler / DE | 02 /
KAUFFMANN, Jochen Rosenstrasse 6 73061 Ebersbach / DE | [2019/36] | Representative(s) | Jell, Friedrich Bismarckstrasse 9 4020 Linz / AT | [2019/36] | Application number, filing date | 17803798.2 | 27.10.2017 | [2019/36] | WO2017EP77672 | Priority number, date | EP20160196109 | 27.10.2016 Original published format: EP 16196109 | [2019/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018078132 | Date: | 03.05.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3533135 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3533135 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H02K15/02 | [2019/36] | CPC: |
H02K15/02 (EP,KR,US);
B32B38/04 (US);
B21D28/02 (KR);
B21D33/00 (KR);
B32B37/12 (US);
B32B37/18 (US);
B32B37/26 (US);
B32B38/1808 (US);
B32B7/12 (US);
B32B2037/268 (US);
B32B2038/042 (US);
B32B2457/00 (US);
Y10T156/1056 (US);
Y10T156/1062 (US);
Y10T156/107 (US);
Y10T156/1074 (US);
Y10T156/1084 (US);
Y10T156/1085 (US);
Y10T156/1093 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERBINDEN VON BLECHTEILEN ZU EINEM BLECHPAKET | [2019/36] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONNECTING SHEET METAL TO A SHEET PACKAGE | [2022/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE LIAISON DE PARTIES DE TÔLES À UN PAQUET DE TÔLES | [2022/09] |
Former [2019/36] | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONNECTING LAMINATION PARTS TO FORM A LAMINATION STACK | ||
Former [2019/36] | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE LIAISON DE PIÈCES DE TÔLE POUR OBTENIR UN NOYAU FEUILLETÉ | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/36] | 27.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2021 | Observations by third parties | 14.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 31.03.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/38] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 31.03.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 31.03.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.04.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 11.10.2023 | HR | 11.10.2023 | MC | 11.10.2023 | RO | 11.10.2023 | RS | 11.10.2023 | SK | 11.10.2023 | SM | 11.10.2023 | NO | 11.01.2024 | GR | 12.01.2024 | IS | 11.02.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | ES | 11.10.2023 | |
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SK | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | ES | 11.10.2023 | |
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 11.10.2023 | |
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 11.10.2023 | |
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 12.01.2024 | |
IS | 11.02.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XP]EP3089335 (STAMPTEC HOLDING GMBH [DE]) [XP] 1-14* paragraph [0033]; figure 5; claims 8,2,3,4,5,9,10,11,12 * | Examination | JPS5450919 | EP2450189 | WO2014089593 | EP2826136 | EP3154069 | by applicant | JPS5450919 | WO2014089593 | EP3089335 | other | EP2826136 |