EP3548610 - NK-MEDIATED IMMUNOTHERAPY AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.08.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fondazione Ri.MED Via Bandiera 11 90133 Palermo / IT | For all designated states Istituto Mediterraneo Per I Trapianti E Terapie Ad Alta Specializzazione . ISMETT Via Discesa dei Giudici 4 90133 Palermo (PA) / IT | [2019/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BADAMI, Ester Fondazione Ri.MED Via Bandiera 11 90133 Palermo (PA) / IT | [2019/41] | Representative(s) | Capasso, Olga De Simone & Partners S.r.l. Via Vincenzo Bellini, 20 00198 Roma / IT | [2021/52] |
Former [2019/41] | Trillat, Anne-Cecile, et al De Simone & Partners S.p.A. Via Vincenzo Bellini, 20 00198 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 17803974.9 | 29.11.2017 | [2019/41] | WO2017EP80848 | Priority number, date | IT20160121081 | 29.11.2016 Original published format: IT201600121081 | [2019/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018099988 | Date: | 07.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3548610 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3548610 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61P35/00, C12N5/0783 | [2021/29] | CPC: |
C12N5/0646 (EP,US);
A61K35/17 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
C12N2501/2302 (EP,US);
C12N2501/2312 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/41] | C12N5/0783 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NK-VERMITTELTE IMMUNTHERAPIE UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2019/41] | English: | NK-MEDIATED IMMUNOTHERAPY AND USES THEREOF | [2019/41] | French: | IMMUNOTHÉRAPIE MÉDIÉE PAR NK ET SES UTILISATIONS | [2019/41] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/41] | 03.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.11.2017 | AL | 29.12.2021 | AT | 29.12.2021 | CY | 29.12.2021 | CZ | 29.12.2021 | EE | 29.12.2021 | ES | 29.12.2021 | FI | 29.12.2021 | HR | 29.12.2021 | LT | 29.12.2021 | LV | 29.12.2021 | MC | 29.12.2021 | MK | 29.12.2021 | MT | 29.12.2021 | PL | 29.12.2021 | RO | 29.12.2021 | RS | 29.12.2021 | SI | 29.12.2021 | SK | 29.12.2021 | SM | 29.12.2021 | BG | 29.03.2022 | NO | 29.03.2022 | GR | 30.03.2022 | IS | 29.04.2022 | PT | 29.04.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 29.11.2017 | |
AL | 29.12.2021 | ||
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CY | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
MK | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 29.11.2017 | |
AL | 29.12.2021 | ||
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CY | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 29.11.2017 | |
AL | 29.12.2021 | ||
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/31] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 29.12.2021 | |
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 29.12.2021 | |
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 29.12.2021 | |
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 29.12.2021 | |
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 29.12.2021 | |
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 29.03.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2012089736 (APEIRON BIOLOGICS AG [AT], et al); | [A]WO2016020434 (JOHANN WOLFGANG GOETHE UNIVERSITÄT [DE]); | Examination | WO2013119118 |