Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018179542 | Global Dossier | 28.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662420801 | 11.11.2016 | US201762558770 | 14.09.2017 | US201715810857 | 13.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20190076050 | Global Dossier | 01.07.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662420801 | 11.11.2016 | US201762558770 | 14.09.2017 | WO2017US61348 | 13.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2019533472 | Global Dossier | 21.11.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662420801 | 11.11.2016 | US201762558770 | 14.09.2017 | WO2017US61348 | 13.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL266525 | Global Dossier | 31.07.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662420801 | 11.11.2016 | US201762558770 | 14.09.2017 | WO2017US61348 | 13.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110234763 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662420801 | 11.11.2016 | US201762558770 | 14.09.2017 | WO2017US61348 | 13.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3043637 | Global Dossier | 17.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662420801 | 11.11.2016 | US201762558770 | 14.09.2017 | WO2017US61348 | 13.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2017356221 | Global Dossier | 30.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662420801 | 11.11.2016 | US201762558770 | 14.09.2017 | WO2017US61348 | 13.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3538654 | Global Dossier | 18.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662420801 | 11.11.2016 | US201762558770 | 14.09.2017 | WO2017US61348 | 13.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR110067 | 20.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662420801 | 11.11.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018089914 | Global Dossier | 17.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662420801 | 11.11.2016 | US201762558770 | 14.09.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW201831684 | 01.09.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662420801 | 11.11.2016 | US201762558770 | 14.09.2017 |