EP3538654 - OLIGONUCLEOTIDE TARGETING STRATEGY FOR HBV CCCDNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.11.2023 [2023/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen BioPharma, Inc. 260 E. Grand Avenue, 2nd Floor South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2019/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRYAZNOV, Sergei 260 East Grand Avenue 2nd Floor South San Francisco California 94080 / US | 02 /
FITZGERALD, Megan 260 E. Grand Ave. 2nd Floor South San Francisco California 94080 / US | 03 /
STOYCHEVA, Antitsa Dimitrova 114 Carnoustie Drive Half Moon Bay, CA 94019 / US | 04 /
HONG, Jin 6 Spruce Ct. Pacifica, CA 94044 / US | [2020/13] |
Former [2019/38] | 01 /
GRYAZNOV, Sergeiq 260 East Grand Avenue 2nd Floor South San Francisco California 94080 / US | ||
02 /
FITZGERALD, Megan 260 E. Grand Ave. 2nd Floor South San Francisco California 94080 / US | |||
03 /
STOYCHEVA, Antitsa Dimitrova 114 Carnoustie Drive Half Moon Bay, CA 94019 / US | |||
04 /
HONG, Jin 6 Spruce Ct. Pacifica, CA 94044 / US | Representative(s) | Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road Holborn London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/38] | Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | Application number, filing date | 17804414.5 | 13.11.2017 | [2019/38] | WO2017US61348 | Priority number, date | US201662420801P | 11.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662420801 P | US201762558770P | 14.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762558770 P | [2019/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018089914 | Date: | 17.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3538654 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113 | [2019/38] | CPC: |
C12N15/1131 (EP,US);
C12N15/113 (KR);
A61K31/7125 (EP,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (KR,US);
A61P31/20 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2310/11 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2310/314 (KR,US);
C12N2310/315 (KR,US);
C12N2310/321 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/38] | Extension states | BA | 21.05.2019 | ME | 21.05.2019 | Title | German: | OLIGONUKLEOTID-TARGETING-STRATEGIE FÜR HBV-CCCDNA | [2019/38] | English: | OLIGONUCLEOTIDE TARGETING STRATEGY FOR HBV CCCDNA | [2019/38] | French: | STRATÉGIE DE CIBLAGE D'OLIGONUCLÉOTIDE POUR L'ADNCCC DU VHB | [2019/38] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/38] | 21.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/44] | 22.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2012145697 (ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,14,15,17,19,20 * page 111, line 9 - line 23 * * page 117 - page 118 * * page 156 * * claim - * * the whole document * [I] 4,8,11,12,16; | [A] - S.M. GRYAZNOV, "Oligonucleotide n3'-->p5' phosphoramidates and thio-phoshoramidates as potential therapeutic agents", Chemistry & biodiversity, Switzerland, (20100301), page 477, URL: http://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/store/10.1002/cbdv.200900187/asset/477_ftp.pdf?v=1&t=jcw5hrtu&s=1e98f50cf2b74417c6a924c09c65ac0f288965cc, (20180126), XP055445374 [A] 8 * the whole document * | [A] - BILLIOUD GAETAN ET AL., "In vivo reduction of hepatitis B virus antigenemia and viremia by antisense oligonucleotides", JOURNAL OF HEPATOLOGY, (20160401), vol. 64, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.JHEP.2015.11.032, ISSN 0168-8278, pages 781 - 789, XP029448832 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jhep.2015.11.032 | [A] - GAETAN BILLIOUD ET AL., "Supplementary information - In vivo reduction of hepatitis B virus antigenemia and viremia by antisense oligonucleotides", JOURNAL OF HEPATOLOGY, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20160401), vol. 64, no. 4, doi:10.1016/j.jhep.2015.11.032, ISSN 0168-8278, pages 781 - 789, XP055445356 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jhep.2015.11.032 | [A] - MOHUBE MAEPA ET AL., "Progress and prospects of anti-HBV gene therapy development", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR SCIENCES, (20150731), vol. 16, no. 8, doi:10.3390/ijms160817589, pages 17589 - 17610, XP055444220 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/ijms160817589 | [A] - KAZUTO TAJIRI ET AL., "New horizon for radical cure of chronic hepatitis B virus infection", WORLD JOURNAL OF HEPATOLOGY, (20160101), vol. 8, no. 21, doi:10.4254/wjh.v8.i21.863, ISSN 1948-5182, page 863, XP055444225 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4254/wjh.v8.i21.863 | by applicant | US6747014 | - KASAMATSU, H.; ROBBERSON, D. L.; VINOGRAD, J., Proc Natl Acad Sci., (19710000), vol. 68, no. 9, pages 2252 - 2257 | - SEBESTA, M. et al., DNA Repair, (20130000), vol. 12, no. 9, pages 691 - 698 | - "Amplification of Genomic DNA", SAIKI et al., PCR PROTOCOLS, Academic Press, (19900000), pages 13 - 20 | - WHARAM et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (20010601), vol. 29, no. 11, pages E54 - E54 | - HAFNER et al., Biotechniques, (20010400), vol. 30, no. 4, pages 852 - 6,858,860 | - ZIELINSKA, D.; PONGRACZ, K; GRYAZNOV, S. M., Tetrahedron Lett., (20060000), vol. 47, pages 4495 - 4499 |