EP3460660 - SLEEP MANAGEMENT METHOD AND DEVICE, AND COMPUTER STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oneplus Technology (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd. Room 201 Building A No.1 Qianwan Road 1 Qianhai Shenzhen-Hong Kong Cooperation Zone Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2019/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Wenyen 18/F Tower C Tai Ran Building No.8 Tai Ran Road Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN | 02 /
PAI, Zongjheng 18/F Tower C Tai Ran Building No.8 Tai Ran Road Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2019/13] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/13] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17805761.8 | 26.05.2017 | [2019/13] | WO2017CN86226 | Priority number, date | CN201610377374 | 31.05.2016 Original published format: CN201610377374 | [2019/13] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017206816 | Date: | 07.12.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3460660 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/48 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
G06F9/48 (EP);
G06F9/4881 (CN);
G06F1/3287 (US);
G06F1/3228 (US);
G06F9/542 (US);
G06F9/544 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/13] | Title | German: | SCHLAFMANAGEMENTVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG SOWIE COMPUTERSPEICHERMEDIUM | [2019/13] | English: | SLEEP MANAGEMENT METHOD AND DEVICE, AND COMPUTER STORAGE MEDIUM | [2019/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE GESTION DE SOMMEIL, ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT INFORMATIQUE | [2019/13] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2018 | Translation filed | 21.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/13] | 06.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.06.2022 | 23.06.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/49] | 01.08.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6848054 (WATTS JR LA VAUGHN F [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]WO2005099107 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2007070074 (JIANG HONG [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US7256788 (LUU VIET-TAM [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * column 4, line 27 - line 49 * * column 7, line 23 - column 8, line 67 * * claims 13, 15 * * figures 3A, 3B *; | [A]US2008155549 (BLINICK STEPHEN L [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2010008278 (KONE MAMADOU [TW], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2012127904 (TOMIZAWA TAKESHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0043] * * claim 1 *; | [A]WO2013081602 (INTEL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2014043631 (HONMA MIKIMASA [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2014181553 (ECKERT YASUKO [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2015121106 (ECKERT YASUKO [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2015286271 (VRIND TUSHAR [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]CN101025913 (INTEL CORP [US]) [A] 1-12* , the whole document *; | [A]CN101312519 (SHENZHEN HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-12 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN101951517 (SHENZHEN TEMOBI SCI & TECH DEV) [A] 1-12 * , the whole document *; | [A]US2012127904 (TOMIZAWA TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * , the whole document *; | [PX]CN106095541 (SHENZHEN ONEPLUS SCIENCE & TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-12 * , claims 1-11, and description, paragraph [0141] * |