EP3450289 - VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2019/10] | For all designated states YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEGUCHI, Motoaki c/o YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | 02 /
MATSUO, Masashi c/o YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | 03 /
FURUSE, Eisuke c/o YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | [2019/10] | Representative(s) | Stöckeler, Ferdinand, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2019/10] | Application number, filing date | 17806548.8 | 26.05.2017 | [2019/10] | WO2017JP19702 | Priority number, date | JP20160107640 | 30.05.2016 Original published format: JP 2016107640 | [2019/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017208992 | Date: | 07.12.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3450289 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3450289 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B62J27/20, B62K5/10, B62K5/08, B62K5/027, B62K5/05, B60R21/16 | [2021/29] | CPC: |
B62J27/20 (EP,US);
B60R21/16 (EP,US);
B60R21/23 (US);
B62K5/027 (EP,US);
B62K5/05 (EP,US);
B62K5/08 (EP,US);
B62K5/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/10] | B62J27/00, B60R21/16, B62K5/05, B62K5/08, B62K5/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUG | [2019/10] | English: | VEHICLE | [2019/10] | French: | VÉHICULE | [2019/10] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2018 | Translation filed | 30.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 30.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/10] | 27.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.06.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 29.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.05.2017 | AL | 15.12.2021 | AT | 15.12.2021 | CY | 15.12.2021 | CZ | 15.12.2021 | DK | 15.12.2021 | EE | 15.12.2021 | ES | 15.12.2021 | FI | 15.12.2021 | HR | 15.12.2021 | LT | 15.12.2021 | LV | 15.12.2021 | MC | 15.12.2021 | MK | 15.12.2021 | NL | 15.12.2021 | PL | 15.12.2021 | RO | 15.12.2021 | RS | 15.12.2021 | SE | 15.12.2021 | SI | 15.12.2021 | SK | 15.12.2021 | SM | 15.12.2021 | TR | 15.12.2021 | BG | 15.03.2022 | NO | 15.03.2022 | GR | 16.03.2022 | IS | 15.04.2022 | PT | 18.04.2022 | GB | 26.05.2022 | IE | 26.05.2022 | LU | 26.05.2022 | BE | 31.05.2022 | CH | 31.05.2022 | LI | 31.05.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 26.05.2017 | |
AL | 15.12.2021 | ||
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CY | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
MK | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
GB | 26.05.2022 | ||
IE | 26.05.2022 | ||
LU | 26.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 26.05.2017 | |
AL | 15.12.2021 | ||
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CY | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
GB | 26.05.2022 | ||
IE | 26.05.2022 | ||
LU | 26.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 26.05.2017 | |
AL | 15.12.2021 | ||
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
GB | 26.05.2022 | ||
IE | 26.05.2022 | ||
LU | 26.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
GB | 26.05.2022 | ||
IE | 26.05.2022 | ||
LU | 26.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
IE | 26.05.2022 | ||
LU | 26.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
IE | 26.05.2022 | ||
LU | 26.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
LU | 26.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
LU | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 15.12.2021 | |
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 15.12.2021 | |
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 15.12.2021 | |
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 15.12.2021 | |
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 15.12.2021 | |
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | FI | 15.12.2021 | |
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | FI | 15.12.2021 | |
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | FI | 15.12.2021 | |
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | FI | 15.12.2021 | |
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 15.12.2021 | |
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 15.12.2021 | |
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 15.03.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2014098227 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-6 * abstract *; | [Y]JP2003011871 (TOYODA GOSEI KK) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JP2003011871 (TOYODA GOSEI KK) [Y] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0019] to [0058]; fig. 1 to 14 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2005008055 (TAKATA CORP) [A] 1-6* , & US 2004/0256848 A1 & CN 1572641 A *; | [A]JP2010228551 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * , (Family: none) *; | [Y]WO2014098227 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0025] to [0099]; fig. 1 to 9 & US 2015/0344097 A1 paragraphs [0063] to [0152]; fig. 1 to 9 & EP 2923933 A1 & CN 104487332 A *; | [A]WO2016052430 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * , & US 2017/0129562 A1 & TW 201620766 A * | Examination | JP2015145152 |