EP3467017 - RUBBER COMPOSITION AND TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 1-1 Kyobashi 3-Chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [2019/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKANO Kosuke c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION 1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2019/15] | Application number, filing date | 17806813.6 | 01.06.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017JP20519 | Priority number, date | JP20160110515 | 01.06.2016 Original published format: JP 2016110515 | [2019/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017209263 | Date: | 07.12.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3467017 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08L7/00, B60C1/00 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
B60C1/00 (EP,US);
B60C1/0016 (US);
C08J7/16 (US);
C08K3/013 (US);
C08K3/04 (US);
C08K3/36 (US);
C08K5/5419 (US);
C08K5/5425 (US);
C08L25/10 (US);
C08L47/00 (US);
C08L7/00 (US);
C08L93/04 (US);
C08L2205/035 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L7/00, C08L15/00, C08K3/36, C08L45/00, C08L57/02 (EP);
C08L7/00, C08L9/06, C08K3/36, C08L45/00, C08L57/02 (EP);
C08L7/00, C08L9/06, C08K3/36, C08L61/12, C08L57/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Title | German: | KAUTSCHUKZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND REIFEN | [2019/15] | English: | RUBBER COMPOSITION AND TIRE | [2019/15] | French: | COMPOSITION DE CAOUTCHOUC, ET PNEUMATIQUE | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2018 | Translation filed | 27.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 27.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 06.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.07.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2009138025 ; | [A]JP2011246565 ; | [A]JP2008174696 ; | [A]DE112011102060T (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2009, no. 43, Database accession no. 2009-K73127, XP002790865 & JP2009138025 A 20090625 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2011, no. 81, Database accession no. 2011-P88596, XP002790866 & JP2011246565 A 20111208 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2008, no. 55, Database accession no. 2008-J45856, XP002790867 & JP2008174696 A 20080731 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | International search | [A]JP2006249403 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [A] 1-5* , entire text & EP 1690895 A1 entire text *; | [X]JP2011126992 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [X] 1-5 * , claims; paragraphs [0001] to [0002], [0016], [0019] to [0025], [0035] to [0036], [0039] to [0041]; table 1; paragraphs [0043] to [0044]; tables 2, 3 (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2011114990 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * , claims & KR 10-2012-0091457 A & CN 102725343 A *; | [X]JP2013043923 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [X] 1-5 * , claims; paragraphs [0001] to [0002], [0019] to [0023], [0031], [0041] to [0044], [0048] to [0051]; tables 1, 2 & CN 102952294 A & KR 10-2013-0023034 A & TW 201309762 A *; | [A]JP2013181069 (NISSHIN KASEI KK) [A] 1-5 * , paragraph [0024]; table 6 (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2012092179 | JP2014009324 |