EP3467019 - RUBBER COMPOSITION, METHOD FOR PRODUCING RUBBER COMPOSITION, AND TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [2019/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HATANAKA Akito c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION 1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2019/15] | Application number, filing date | 17806814.4 | 01.06.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017JP20520 | Priority number, date | JP20160110516 | 01.06.2016 Original published format: JP 2016110516 | [2019/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017209264 | Date: | 07.12.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3467019 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08L9/00, B60C1/00, B60C11/00, C08K3/04, C08K3/36, C08L45/00, C08L57/02, C08L61/06, C08L93/04 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
B60C1/00 (EP);
C08L9/06 (US);
B60C1/0016 (US);
B60C11/00 (EP);
C08K11/005 (US);
C08K3/04 (EP,US);
C08K3/36 (EP,US);
C08K5/0025 (US);
C08L45/00 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L9/00, C08L7/00, C08L9/06, C08K3/36, C08L45/00 (EP);
C08L9/00, C08L7/00, C08L9/06, C08K3/36, C08L47/00 (EP);
C08L9/00, C08L7/00, C08L9/06, C08K3/36, C08L57/02 (EP);
C08L9/00, C08L7/00, C08L9/06, C08K3/36, C08L61/06 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Title | German: | KAUTSCHUKZUSAMMENSETZUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER KAUTSCHUKZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND REIFEN | [2019/15] | English: | RUBBER COMPOSITION, METHOD FOR PRODUCING RUBBER COMPOSITION, AND TIRE | [2019/15] | French: | COMPOSITION DE CAOUTCHOUC, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE COMPOSITION DE CAOUTCHOUC, ET PNEUMATIQUE | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2018 | Translation filed | 27.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 27.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 13.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.07.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2270088 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [X]WO2012085063 (MICHELIN & CIE [FR], et al) [X] 1-9 * claims 1-6, 23; tables 5, 6 *; | [A]WO2014016340 (MICHELIN & CIE [FR], et al) [A] 1-9 * claims 1-4 *; | [A]EP3000618 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | International search | [X]JP2013028650 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [X] 1-9* , claims; paragraphs [0001] to [0004], [0085] to [0112]; tables 2, 3 & US 2013/0030102 A1 claims; paragraphs [0001] to [0004], [0104] to [0173]; tables 2, 3 *; | [X]WO2014178336 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [X] 1-9 * , claims; paragraphs [0001] to [0012], [0053] to [0054], [0068] to [0091]; table 2 & US 2016/0052340 A1 claims; paragraphs [0001] to [0017], [0068] to [0069], [0084] to [0105]; table 2 & EP 2985310 A1 & CN 105164196 A *; | [X]JP2014214297 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [X] 1-9 * , claims; paragraphs [0014], [0052] to [0065]; table 1 & EP 2799480 A1 claims; paragraphs [0013], [0060] to [0074]; table 1 & CN 104130461 A *; | [X]WO2015104955 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [X] 1-9 * , claims; paragraphs [0001] to [0004], [0014], [0068] to [0081]; table 2 & EP 3081587 A1 claims; paragraphs [0001] to [0004], [0014], [0071] to [0089]; table 2 & CN 105849174 A *; | [X]JP2016094559 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [X] 1-9 * , claims; paragraphs [0018] to [0019], [0021], [0053] to [0055], [0078] to [0079], [0083] to [0099]; table 1 & WO 2016/076424 A1 * |