EP3466570 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SILVER-COATED COPPER NANOWIRE HAVING CORE-SHELL STRUCTURE BY USING CHEMICAL REDUCTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bioneer Corporation 8-11, Munpyeongseo-ro Daedeok-gu Daejeon 34302 / KR | [2019/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Han Oh 208-601 448 Expo-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34049 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Jae Ha 103-801 55 Gyeryong-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34169 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Jun Pyo 203-2502 13 Baeul 1-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34022 / KR | 04 /
YUN, Kug Jin 9-304 21 Baejae-ro 91beon-gil Seo-gu Daejeon 35347 / KR | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/17] |
Former [2019/15] | Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 17806967.0 | 30.05.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017KR05600 | Priority number, date | KR20160069400 | 03.06.2016 Original published format: KR 20160069400 | [2019/15] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017209474 | Date: | 07.12.2017 | Language: | KO | [2017/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3466570 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3466570 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B22F9/24, B22F1/02, B22F1/00, H01B1/02 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
H01B1/02 (EP,US);
B22F9/24 (EP,KR,US);
B22F1/0547 (EP,KR,US);
B22F1/17 (EP,KR,US);
B22F2301/10 (KR);
B22F2301/255 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2019/15] | B22F9/24, B22F1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SILBERBESCHICHTETEM KUPFER-NANODRAHT MIT KERN-SCHALE-STRUKTUR UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES CHEMISCHEN REDUKTIONSVERFAHRENS | [2019/15] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SILVER-COATED COPPER NANOWIRE HAVING CORE-SHELL STRUCTURE BY USING CHEMICAL REDUCTION METHOD | [2019/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN NANOFIL DE CUIVRE REVÊTU D'ARGENT AYANT UNE STRUCTURE NOYAU-ENVELOPPE AU MOYEN D'UN PROCÉDÉ DE RÉDUCTION CHIMIQUE | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2018 | Translation filed | 12.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 12.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 15.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.05.2017 | AL | 27.04.2022 | AT | 27.04.2022 | CY | 27.04.2022 | CZ | 27.04.2022 | DK | 27.04.2022 | EE | 27.04.2022 | ES | 27.04.2022 | FI | 27.04.2022 | HR | 27.04.2022 | IT | 27.04.2022 | LT | 27.04.2022 | LV | 27.04.2022 | MC | 27.04.2022 | MK | 27.04.2022 | NL | 27.04.2022 | PL | 27.04.2022 | RO | 27.04.2022 | RS | 27.04.2022 | SE | 27.04.2022 | SI | 27.04.2022 | SK | 27.04.2022 | SM | 27.04.2022 | IE | 30.05.2022 | LU | 30.05.2022 | BE | 31.05.2022 | CH | 31.05.2022 | LI | 31.05.2022 | BG | 27.07.2022 | NO | 27.07.2022 | GR | 28.07.2022 | IS | 27.08.2022 | PT | 29.08.2022 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 30.05.2017 | |
AL | 27.04.2022 | ||
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CY | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
IE | 30.05.2022 | ||
LU | 30.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 30.05.2017 | |
AL | 27.04.2022 | ||
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
IE | 30.05.2022 | ||
LU | 30.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
IE | 30.05.2022 | ||
LU | 30.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
IE | 30.05.2022 | ||
LU | 30.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
IE | 30.05.2022 | ||
LU | 30.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
LU | 30.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
LU | 30.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
LU | 30.05.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 27.04.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5945158 (DJOKIC STOJAN [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]KR20110059946 (KOREA INST GEOSCIENCE & MINERA [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1, 5 *; | [A]WO2011071885 (UNIV DUKE [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y]WO2015194850 (BIONEER CORP [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *; | [YP]EP3159078 (BIONEER CORP [KR]) [YP] 1-15 * claims 1, 3, 6-7, 10, 12-13 * | International search | [A]KR20070104802 (PHOENIX DISPLAY ELECTRONICS CO [KR]) [A] 1-24 * See paragraphs [0018]-[0022] and claims 1-3. *; | [Y]KR20110000599 (KIM YONG JIN [KR], et al) [Y] 1-9, 11-24 * See paragraphs [0047]-[0053] and claims 1-8. *; | [A]KR20120115298 (UNIV DUKE [US]) [A] 1-24 * See paragraph [003 1] and claims 13, 20-25. *; | [A]KR20150045903 (LG CHEM, LTD.) [A] 1-24* See paragraphs [0039]-[0043]. *; | [YA]KR20150145892 (BIONEER CORP [KR]) [Y] 1-9, 11-24 * See paragraphs [0037]-[0043], [0075]-[0078] and claims 1-15. * [A] 10 |