EP3465149 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING A CONCENTRATION OF A SUBSTANCE IN A LIQUID MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2020 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brännström Gruppen AB Uddevallagatan 14 416 70 Göteborg / SE | [2019/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRÄNNSTRÖM, Roland Jonseredsgatan 7 416 70 Göteborg / SE | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Bergenstråhle & Partners AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/15] | Bergenstråhle Group AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 17807117.1 | 31.05.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017SE50582 | Priority number, date | SE20160050784 | 03.06.2016 Original published format: SE 1650784 | SE20160051407 | 27.10.2016 Original published format: SE 1651407 | [2019/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017209685 | Date: | 07.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3465149 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 07.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/18, G01N21/65, G01N21/64, // G01N21/85, G01J3/44 | [2019/17] | CPC: |
G01N21/65 (EP,KR,US);
G01N21/35 (KR,SE);
G01N21/39 (KR,SE);
G01N21/00 (SE);
G01N21/3577 (SE);
G01N21/64 (US);
G01N21/645 (EP,KR);
G01N21/85 (EP,US);
G01N33/1833 (EP,US);
G01J2003/1213 (EP);
G01J3/44 (EP);
G01J3/4406 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/15] | G01N21/35, G01N21/00, G01N21/39 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER KONZENTRATION EINER SUBSTANZ IN EINEM FLÜSSIGMEDIUM | [2019/15] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING A CONCENTRATION OF A SUBSTANCE IN A LIQUID MEDIUM | [2019/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR DÉTERMINER LA CONCENTRATION D'UNE SUBSTANCE DANS UN MILIEU LIQUIDE | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 22.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/17] | 27.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3510648 (LEGER ALTON JR) [Y] 1,2,7-13,15 * column 1, lines 33-41, 52-61 * * column 4, lines 23-42 * * column 5, lines 49-52, 60 * * column 6, lines 8-40 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]US3806727 (LEONARD D, et al) [Y] 1,2,7-13,15 * column 2, lines 33-57 *; | [XI]JP2009103479 (NAT MARITIME RES INST) [X] 1-3,13 * paragraphs [0026] , [0027] , [0032] - [0034] * * figure 3 * [I] 5-11,15; | [A]US2011240887 (CHRISTENSEN WILLIAM M [US], et al) [A] 8* paragraph [0012] *; | [XI]JP2012145390 (NAT MARITIME RES INST) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0003] , [0018] , [0022] , [0038] * * figure 1 * [I] 5-11,13-15; | [A]US8395770 (HUG WILLIAM F [US], et al) [A] 9-12,15 * figure 9C * | International search | [A]US3806727 (LEONARD D ET AL) [A] 1-16 * ; abstract; figures 1-2; claims 1-2; description, column 1, lines 45-48; column 2, lines 33-56; column 3, lines 25-31 *; | [A]US2012018829 (BECK MARKUS E ET AL) [A] 8 * ; claims 1,20 *; | [A]WO0140771 (APS TECHNOLOGY INC ET AL) [A] 1-16 * ; abstract *; | [A]CA2597000 (CANAS TRIANA JESUS ALBERTO ET AL) [A] 1-16 * ; abstract *; | [A]US2015090900 (BANKS RODNEY H ET AL) [A] 1-16 * ; abstract *; | [A]WO2007143047 (ECOLAB INC ETAL) [A] 1-16 * ; abstract *; | [A]US2003025909 (HALLSTADIUS HANS) [A] 1-16 * ; abstract *; | [A]US4555179 (LANGERHOLC JOHN ET AL) [A] 1-16 * ; abstract; claims 1-15 * |