EP3490798 - CO-EXTRUDED PVC-BASED FOOD PACKAGING FOIL AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/23] | COEXTRUDED PVC-BASED FOOD PACKAGING FILM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | ||
[2022/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 30.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schmidt, Waldemar Vladimir Zum Weidentor 14 67346 Speyer / DE | For all designated states Schmidt, Natalya Zum Weidentor 14 67346 Speyer / DE | [2022/28] |
Former [2019/23] | For all designated states Schmidt, Waldemar Zum Weidentor 14 67346 Speyer / DE | ||
For all designated states Schmidt, Natalya Zum Weidentor 14 67346 Speyer / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMIDT, Waldemar Vladimir Zum Weidentor 14 67346 Speyer / DE | [2019/23] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Dr. Keller, Schwertfeger Partnerschaft mbB Westring 17 76829 Landau / DE | [2019/23] | Application number, filing date | 17808039.6 | 20.11.2017 | [2019/23] | WO2017EP79737 | Priority number, date | DE201610122818 | 25.11.2016 Original published format: DE102016122818 | [2019/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018095847 | Date: | 31.05.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3490798 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3490798 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/08, B32B27/30, B32B25/08, C08J5/18, C08K5/00 | [2019/23] | CPC: |
B32B25/08 (EP,US);
B65D65/40 (US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/304 (EP,US);
C08J3/18 (US);
C08J5/18 (US);
C08K5/0016 (EP,US);
B32B2250/24 (EP,US);
B32B2250/246 (US);
B32B2264/00 (EP,US);
B32B2264/12 (EP,US);
B32B2270/00 (EP,US);
B32B2307/7242 (EP,US);
B32B2307/732 (EP,US);
B32B2439/70 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CO-EXTRUDIERTE PVC-BASIERTE LEBENSMITTELVERPACKUNGSFOLIE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2019/23] | English: | CO-EXTRUDED PVC-BASED FOOD PACKAGING FOIL AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2022/07] | French: | FEUILLE D'EMBALLAGE D'ALIMENTS À BASE DE PVC CO-EXTRUDÉE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2022/07] |
Former [2019/23] | COEXTRUDED PVC-BASED FOOD PACKAGING FILM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | ||
Former [2019/23] | FILM D'EMBALLAGE DE PRODUIT ALIMENTAIRE À BASE DE PVC COEXTRUDÉ ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/23] | 07.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.11.2017 | AL | 13.07.2022 | BG | 13.07.2022 | CY | 13.07.2022 | CZ | 13.07.2022 | DK | 13.07.2022 | EE | 13.07.2022 | FI | 13.07.2022 | HR | 13.07.2022 | LT | 13.07.2022 | LV | 13.07.2022 | MC | 13.07.2022 | MK | 13.07.2022 | MT | 13.07.2022 | NL | 13.07.2022 | RO | 13.07.2022 | RS | 13.07.2022 | SE | 13.07.2022 | SI | 13.07.2022 | SK | 13.07.2022 | SM | 13.07.2022 | TR | 13.07.2022 | NO | 13.10.2022 | GR | 14.10.2022 | IS | 13.11.2022 | PT | 14.11.2022 | LU | 20.11.2022 | BE | 30.11.2022 | CH | 30.11.2022 | LI | 30.11.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/34] | HU | 20.11.2017 | |
AL | 13.07.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
CY | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
MK | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
TR | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
LU | 20.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/29] | HU | 20.11.2017 | |
AL | 13.07.2022 | ||
CY | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
MK | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
TR | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
LU | 20.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 20.11.2017 | |
AL | 13.07.2022 | ||
CY | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
MK | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
LU | 20.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 20.11.2017 | |
AL | 13.07.2022 | ||
CY | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
LU | 20.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 20.11.2017 | |
AL | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
LU | 20.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
LU | 20.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
LU | 20.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/31] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | CZ | 13.07.2022 | |
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | CZ | 13.07.2022 | |
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 13.07.2022 | |
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 13.07.2022 | |
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 13.07.2022 | |
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 13.07.2022 | |
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 13.07.2022 | |
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | NL | 13.07.2022 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2043533 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD) [X] 1-13 * abstract *; | [X]US4959269 (DEHENNAU CLAUDE [BE]) [X] 1,6 * abstract * * column 3 *; | [XA]WO2011110567 (SOLVAY [BE], et al) [X] 1,6 * abstract * [A] 2-5,7-13; | [A]WO2012026861 (PERSTORP AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-13* abstract *; | [X]US2013225737 (GOSSE CLAUDIUS P [DE], et al) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0057] , [0144] , [0145] * | Examination | AU4386872 | GB1385196 | US4212153 | US4320175 | US4585694 | EP0530622 | EP0627465 | US5789046 | US6159616 | WO0136194 | KR20030002350 | WO03029339 | US2005170161 | WO2007072494 | EP2052857 | EP2308677 | US2011210037 | WO2014043744 | US2014088233 | WO2014055126 | WO2017202510 | by applicant | DE2839083 | DD234431 | FR2686887 | FR2691436 | DE19503326 | DE19650573 | DE19621688 | DE19704275 | EP0807132 | DE102004000023 | DE102005009664 | DE102006031841 | US2010310891 | US2016276105 |