EP3536050 - ON/OFF TIME MASK FOR SHORT TTI [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2019/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGLJUNG, Christian Trädgårdsgatan 9E SE-223 53 Lund / SE | 02 /
KAZMI, Muhammad Skrivargatan 7 SE-174 64 Sundbyberg / SE | 03 /
RAHMAN, Imadur Rådjursstigen 20 SE-191 46 Sollentuna / SE | [2019/37] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/37] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 17808158.4 | 03.11.2017 | [2019/37] | WO2017IB56890 | Priority number, date | US201662417729P | 04.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662417729 P | US201662418523P | 07.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662418523 P | [2019/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018083659 | Date: | 11.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3536050 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3536050 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/04, H04W52/36 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
H04W52/36 (EP,US);
H04W52/0216 (US);
H04W52/146 (US);
H04W72/1268 (US);
H04W76/28 (US);
H04W72/23 (US)
|
Former IPC [2019/37] | H04W52/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EIN-/AUSSCHALTZEITMASKE FÜR KURZE TTI | [2019/37] | English: | ON/OFF TIME MASK FOR SHORT TTI | [2019/37] | French: | MASQUE TEMPOREL MARCHE/ARRÊT POUR TTI COURT | [2019/37] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/37] | 30.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.11.2017 | AL | 06.07.2022 | BG | 06.07.2022 | CY | 06.07.2022 | CZ | 06.07.2022 | EE | 06.07.2022 | FI | 06.07.2022 | HR | 06.07.2022 | LT | 06.07.2022 | LV | 06.07.2022 | MC | 06.07.2022 | MK | 06.07.2022 | MT | 06.07.2022 | RO | 06.07.2022 | RS | 06.07.2022 | SI | 06.07.2022 | SK | 06.07.2022 | SM | 06.07.2022 | NO | 06.10.2022 | LU | 03.11.2022 | IS | 06.11.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/34] | HU | 03.11.2017 | |
AL | 06.07.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
CY | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
MK | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
LU | 03.11.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 03.11.2017 | |
AL | 06.07.2022 | ||
CY | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
MK | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
LU | 03.11.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 03.11.2017 | |
AL | 06.07.2022 | ||
CY | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
LU | 03.11.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 03.11.2017 | |
AL | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
LU | 03.11.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
LU | 03.11.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/31] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | CZ | 06.07.2022 | |
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | CZ | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 06.07.2022 | |
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 06.07.2022 | |
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 06.07.2022 | |
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 06.07.2022 | |
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2015031410 (LIM SUHWAN [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,9,12-15,17,18,20,23-26,28,29,31,34-37,39,40,42,45,46 * figures 17-20 * * paragraph [0299] - paragraph [0300] * * paragraph [0309] * * paragraph [0312] - paragraph [0317] * [I] 11,22,33,44; | [XP] - ERICSSON, "Implication of sTTI operation on UL ON/OFF time mask", vol. RAN WG4, no. Reno, Nevada, USA; 20161114 - 20161118, (20161107), 3GPP DRAFT; R4-1610472 ON-OFF MASK FOR STTI, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG4_Radio/TSGR4_81/Docs/, (20161107), XP051195524 [XP] 1,12,23,34,45,46 * the whole document * | [AP] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Further discussion on UL ON/OFF time mask", vol. RAN WG4, no. Athens, Greece; 20170213 - 20170217, (20170212), 3GPP DRAFT; R4-1701257 [STTI] FURTHER DISCUSSION ON UL ONOFF TIME MASK, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ;, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN4/Docs/, (20170212), XP051214313 [AP] 1-46 * the whole document * | [A] - 3gpp, "3GPP TS 36.101 V14.1.0", (20161012), pages 131 - 139, URL: https://portal.3gpp.org/desktopmodules/Specifications/SpecificationDetails.aspx?specificationId=2411, (20180124), XP055443828 [A] 1-46 * page 131 - page 139 * | Examination | EP2405695 |