EP3321156 - POSE VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.03.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen Dynamic Balance Technology Co., Ltd. No. 92, Zhugushi Road Zhugushi Industrial Park, Wulian Community Longgang Street, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518116 / CN | [2020/04] |
Former [2018/20] | For all designated states Shenzhen Valuelink E-Commerce Co., Ltd. 2nd two-way ChangJiangPu, Heao community Henggang Street Office Longgang District Shenzhen City / CN | ||
For all designated states Shenzhen Dynamic Balance Technology Co., Ltd. No. 92, Zhugushi Road Zhugushi Industrial Park, Wulian Community Longgang Street, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518116 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Lifang Group 3 Xiaotai Village Caisanghu Town Junshan District Yueyang Hunan 414000 / CN | [2018/20] | Representative(s) | Zaboliene, Reda, et al Metida Business center Vertas Gyneju str. 16 01109 Vilnius / LT | [N/P] |
Former [2018/20] | Vitina, Maruta, et al Agency TRIA ROBIT P.O. Box 22 1010 Riga / LV | Application number, filing date | 17808299.6 | 29.06.2017 | [2018/20] | WO2017CN90922 | Priority number, date | CN201610749689 | 29.08.2016 Original published format: CN201610749689 | [2018/20] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018040714 | Date: | 08.03.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3321156 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3321156 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B62K11/00, B62K23/08, A63C17/01, A63C17/12 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
B62K11/007 (EP,US);
B62K3/002 (CN);
A63C17/014 (EP,US);
A63C17/12 (EP,US);
B62K23/08 (EP,US);
A63C2203/12 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/45] | B62K3/00, B62K23/08, B62K11/00 | ||
Former IPC [2018/20] | B62K3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALTUNGSFAHRZEUG | [2018/20] | English: | POSE VEHICLE | [2018/20] | French: | VÉHICULE DE POSE | [2018/20] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2017 | Translation filed | 13.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 13.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/20] | 13.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2020 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 22.01.2021 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 24.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   24.10.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.01.2024 | BG | 24.01.2024 | ES | 24.01.2024 | FI | 24.01.2024 | HR | 24.01.2024 | LT | 24.01.2024 | LV | 24.01.2024 | NL | 24.01.2024 | PL | 24.01.2024 | SE | 24.01.2024 | NO | 24.04.2024 | RS | 24.04.2024 | GR | 25.04.2024 | IS | 24.05.2024 | PT | 24.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 24.01.2024 | |
BG | 24.01.2024 | ||
ES | 24.01.2024 | ||
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
LV | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
PL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
PT | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 24.01.2024 | |
BG | 24.01.2024 | ||
ES | 24.01.2024 | ||
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 24.01.2024 | |
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 24.01.2024 | |
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 24.01.2024 | |
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 24.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007084662 (OIKAWA SUSUMU [JP]) [A] 1,10 * figures 1-14 *; | [A]US2013248573 (KIM JOON HYUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1,7,10,19 * figures 1-6 *; | [XI]CN105270526 (JIANGSU DI AN NEW ENERGY VEHICLE INDUSTRY CO LTD) [X] 1-6,8,9 * Detailed Description of the Invention;; figures 1-6 * [I] 7; | [XI]CN105644672 (CHANGZHOU AIRWHEEL INTELLIGENT TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 10-18,20 * embodiment 1;; figures 1-9 * [I] 19; | [A]CN205365967U (LU NANFANG) [A] 1,10 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]CN205469471U (LIU HAIBO) [A] 1,10* figures 1-12 * | International search | [A]US8738278 (CHEN SHANE [US]) [A] 1-20* , entire document *; | [A]CN105644672 (CHANGZHOU AIRWHEEL INTELLIGENT TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]CN105667660 (WANG KESHI) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]CN105711726 (ZHU YONGGANG) [A] 1-20 * , description, paragraphs [0032]-[0063], and figures 1-3 *; | [A]CN205345191U (SHENZHEN GAUSSTOP TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]CN105730574 (SHENZHEN BAUSSTOP TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * . entire document *; | [PX]CN106275170 (LI LIFANG) [PX] 1-9 * , description, paragraphs [0026]-[0036], and figures 1-5 *; | [PX]CN206202530U (LI LIFANG) [PX] 1-9 * , description, paragraphs [0026]-[0036], and figures 1-5 * |