EP3529283 - THERMALLY TUNABLE PHOSPHINIMINE CATALYSTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.04.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nova Chemicals (International) S.A. Avenue de la Gare 14 1700 Fribourg / CH | [2019/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORRISON, Darryl 2421 - 22A Street NW Calgary, Alberta T2M 3X8 / CA | [2019/35] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2023/48] |
Former [2019/35] | Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 17808576.7 | 12.10.2017 | [2019/35] | WO2017IB56331 | Priority number, date | CA20162945595 | 19.10.2016 Original published format: CA 2945595 | [2019/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018073705 | Date: | 26.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3529283 | Date: | 28.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3529283 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C08F4/6592, C08F210/16, C08F2/06, C08F210/14 | [2019/35] | CPC: |
C08F4/65908 (EP,US);
C08F4/6592 (US);
C08F210/16 (EP,US);
C08F4/65912 (EP,US);
B01J31/1845 (US);
C08F2/06 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08F210/16, C08F2/06 (US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F4/6592 (EP,US);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/03 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THERMISCH ABSTIMMBARE PHOSPHINIMINKATALYSATOREN | [2019/35] | English: | THERMALLY TUNABLE PHOSPHINIMINE CATALYSTS | [2019/35] | French: | CATALYSEURS DE PHOSPHINIMINE À RÉGLAGE THERMIQUE | [2019/35] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/35] | 21.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 29.11.2023 | ES | 29.11.2023 | HR | 29.11.2023 | PL | 29.11.2023 | RO | 29.11.2023 | RS | 29.11.2023 | SK | 29.11.2023 | SM | 29.11.2023 | NO | 29.02.2024 | GR | 01.03.2024 | IS | 29.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 29.11.2023 | |
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RO | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 01.03.2024 | |
IS | 29.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0125328 (NOVA CHEM INT SA [CH], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 18, line 31 - page 23, line 10 *; | [A]WO02092649 (NOVA CHEM INT SA [CH], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 12, paragraph last - page 14, paragraph third * * examples 2,7-10,12; table 1 * * claims 1,10 *; | [A]EP1669376 (NOVA CHEM INT SA [CH]) [A] 1-11* examples 1-5; table 1 * | by applicant | WO9303093 | US5376439 | US5589555 | US6160064 | US6372864 | US6559262 | US6777509 | US6960550 | US6984695 | - BERCAW et al., Organometallics, (20120000), vol. 31, page 1965 | - PANGBORN, A. B.; GIARDELLO, M. A.; GRUBBS, R. H.; ROSEN R. K.; TIMMERS, F. J., Organometallics, (19960000), vol. 15, pages 1518 - 1520 | - MALDANIS, R. J.; CHIEN, J. C. W.; RAUSCH, M. D., J. Organomet. Chem., (20000000), vol. 599, page 107 | - MILLER, S. A.; BERCAW, J. E., Organometallics, (20040000), vol. 23, pages 1777 - 1789 | - STEPHAN, D. W.; STEWART, J. C.; GUERIN, F.; COURTENAY, S.; KICKHAM, J.; HOLLINK, E.; BEDDIE, C.; HOSKIN, A.; GRAHAM, T.; WEI, P., Organometallics, (20030000), vol. 22, pages 1937 - 1947 | - GUNTHER, H., NMR Spectroscopy, John Wiley & Sons, (19950000), pages 336 - 345 |