25.08.2023 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 27.09.2023 [2023/39] |
20.05.2023 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
15.12.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.10.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.10.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.01.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.11.2020 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.10.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.07.2020 |
Issuance of search results under Rule 164(2) EPC together with a communication from the examining division |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
10.07.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
10.07.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
10.07.2020 |
First examination report |
|
08.07.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.05.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
17.01.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
17.01.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
02.12.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
24.09.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.08.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39] |
23.08.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
23.08.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39] |
29.07.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.07.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.06.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.05.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
28.05.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.06.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.05.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.12.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|