EP3541856 - METHODS FOR MAKING A METAL, SAND OR CERAMIC OBJECT BY ADDITIVE MANUFACTURE AND FORMULATIONS FOR USE IN SAID METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2023 [2023/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Photocentric Limited Cambridge House Oxney Road Peterborough, Cambridgeshire PE1 5YW / GB | [2019/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLT, Paul c/o PhotoCentriC Limited Cambridge House Oxney Road Peterborough ca PE1 5YW / GB | [2019/39] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/39] | HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 17808978.5 | 15.11.2017 | [2019/39] | WO2017GB53442 | Priority number, date | GB20160019422 | 16.11.2016 Original published format: GB 201619422 | [2019/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018091891 | Date: | 24.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3541856 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/44, C08F2/50, G03F7/027, C08J3/24, C09D11/101, B33Y70/00, B33Y10/00, B29C64/214, B29C64/218, B29C64/286, B29C64/291, B29C64/165, B33Y30/00, B22F3/00, C09D11/38 | [2020/33] | CPC: |
G03F7/029 (EP,US);
B22F10/12 (EP,US);
B22F10/14 (EP,US);
B22F10/68 (EP,US);
B22F12/41 (EP,US);
B22F12/67 (EP,US);
B29C64/165 (EP,US);
B29C64/214 (EP);
B29C64/218 (EP);
B29C64/286 (EP);
B29C64/291 (EP);
B33Y10/00 (EP);
B33Y30/00 (EP);
B33Y70/10 (EP,US);
C08F2/44 (EP);
C08F2/50 (EP);
C09D11/101 (EP);
C09D11/38 (EP);
G03F7/0037 (EP);
G03F7/0047 (EP);
B22F10/16 (EP,US);
B22F10/73 (EP,US);
B22F12/63 (EP,US);
B22F2999/00 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B22F2999/00, B22F10/12, B22F3/003 (EP,US);
B22F2999/00, B22F10/14, B22F3/003 (EP,US);
B22F2999/00, B22F10/16, B22F3/003 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/39] | C08F2/44, C08F2/50, G03F7/027, C08J3/24, C09D11/101, B29C64/129, B33Y70/00, B33Y10/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES METALL-, SAND- ODER KERAMIKOBJEKTS DURCH GENERATIVE FERTIGUNG UND FORMULIERUNGEN ZUR VERWENDUNG IN BESAGTEN VERFAHREN | [2019/39] | English: | METHODS FOR MAKING A METAL, SAND OR CERAMIC OBJECT BY ADDITIVE MANUFACTURE AND FORMULATIONS FOR USE IN SAID METHODS | [2019/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION D'UN OBJET EN MÉTAL, EN SABLE OU EN CÉRAMIQUE PAR FABRICATION ADDITIVE ET FORMULATIONS DESTINÉES À ÊTRE UTILISÉES DANS DE TELS PROCÉDÉS | [2019/39] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/39] | 28.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M06) [2020/33] | 13.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/39] | 19.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6140384 (SORORI TADAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-23 * example 1, material No. 1; column 70 - column 76; table 1 *; | [Y]JP2003241625 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [Y] 1-23 * example; paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0046] *; | [XP]WO2017051182 (PHOTOCENTRIC LTD [GB]) [XP] 1-7,11-13,18-20* example 8 *; | [Y] - SHYH-YUAN LEE ET AL, "Development of a Three-Dimensional Slurry Printing System Using Dynamic Mask Projection for Fabricating Zirconia Dental Implants", MATERIALS AND MANUFACTURING PROCESSES., US, (20141124), vol. 30, no. 12, doi:10.1080/10426914.2014.984208, ISSN 1042-6914, pages 1498 - 1504, XP055450033 [Y] 1-23 * Materials and Methods; page 1499 - page 1501 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/10426914.2014.984208 |