EP3541625 - TRANSFER SYSTEM FOR ELECTRONIC-TECHNOLOGY TEXTILE PRINTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.11.2023 [2023/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Policrom Screens S.p.A Piazza Matteotti 20 24122 Bergamo (BG) / IT | [2019/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAVASSORI BISUTTI, Giorgio Via Ghislandi 2 24125 Bergamo / IT | 02 /
SABATINI, Valentina Via Predazzi 48 24030 Carvico (BG) / IT | [2019/39] | Representative(s) | Gregorj S.r.l. Via L. Muratori, 13/b 20135 Milano / IT | [2019/39] | Application number, filing date | 17809023.9 | 10.11.2017 | [2019/39] | WO2017IB57038 | Priority number, date | IT20160115345 | 15.11.2016 Original published format: IT201600115345 | [2019/39] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018092009 | Date: | 24.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3541625 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/08, B32B27/28, B32B27/30, B32B27/36, B32B27/40, B41F16/02, B41J2/325, B41J2/335, C08J7/14, C09K13/04, H05K3/12, B41M5/03, B41M5/50, B41M5/52, C08J7/12 | [2019/39] | CPC: |
B32B27/40 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/285 (EP,US);
B32B27/286 (EP);
B32B27/288 (EP);
B32B27/308 (EP);
B32B27/36 (EP,US);
B32B27/365 (EP);
B41F15/0831 (EP);
B41F16/02 (EP);
B41J2/33535 (EP,US);
C08J7/12 (EP);
C08J7/14 (EP);
D06P5/003 (EP);
D06Q1/12 (EP,US);
H05K3/207 (EP);
B32B2255/10 (EP,US);
B32B2255/20 (EP,US);
B32B2255/26 (EP,US);
B32B2307/30 (EP,US);
B32B2307/734 (EP);
B32B2437/00 (EP);
B32B2457/08 (EP);
H05K1/038 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/39] | Title | German: | TRANSFERSYSTEM FÜR TEXTILDRUCK MIT ELEKTRONISCHER TECHNOLOGIE | [2019/39] | English: | TRANSFER SYSTEM FOR ELECTRONIC-TECHNOLOGY TEXTILE PRINTING | [2019/39] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRANSFERT POUR IMPRESSION SUR TEXTILE DE TECHNOLOGIE ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2019/39] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/39] | 07.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/44] | 22.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP3593361B (SANEI CHEM KK) [Y] 1-16 * example 1 * * the whole document *; | [A]GB2419110 (MURRAY NICHOLAS JOHN [GB], et al) [A] 1-16 * example 1 * * the whole document *; | [A]WO2008040992 (KISS CUT TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-16 * claims 1,12,15,17 * * page 4, lines 12-17 * * page 11, lines 1-8,19-28 * * page 15, line 18 - page 16, line 2 *; | [Y]WO2011027375 (POLICROM SCREENS S P A [IT], et al) [Y] 1-16 * claims 1,9 * * page 4, line 17 - page 5, line 3 * * page 9, lines 1-9 * * the whole document *; | [T]US2015290910 (HALLER HEINZ [DE], et al) [T] * claims 7,18 ** paragraphs [0007] - [0010] * |