Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3545218
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
12.03.2021 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] |
08.12.2020 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
16.11.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.07.2020 |
First examination report |
|
26.06.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
31.01.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] |
31.01.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] |
10.01.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
16.11.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.08.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] |
30.08.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
30.08.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] |
09.08.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.07.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.06.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.05.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
28.05.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.07.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.06.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.12.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|