Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020080511 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE1651554 | 28.11.2016 | WO2017SE51166 | 24.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20190077105 | Global Dossier | 02.07.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | SE1651554 | 28.11.2016 | WO2017SE51166 | 24.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109983262B | Global Dossier | 10.11.2020 | B | CN109983262 | 05.07.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | SE1651554 | 28.11.2016 | WO2017SE51166 | 24.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3545218 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE1651554 | 28.11.2016 | WO2017SE51166 | 24.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112019010586 | 17.09.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | SE1651554 | 28.11.2016 | WO2017SE51166 | 24.11.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018097792 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE1651554 | 28.11.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SE542479 | 19.05.2020 | C2 | SE1651554 | 29.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE1651554 | 28.11.2016 |