EP3538483 - SYNTHESIS GAS PRODUCTION PROCESS FOR THE IMPLEMENTATION OF A NATURAL GAS LIQUEFACTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, MK | published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Air Liquide Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75 quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | [2019/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COSTA DE BEAUREGARD, Pierre 6 rue Claude Matrat 92130 Issy Les Moulineaux / FR | 02 /
MARTY, Pascal 29 rue du Four 94360 Bry Sur Marne / FR | 03 /
MOREL, Thomas c/o AIR LIQUIDE GLOBAL E&C SOLUTIONS FRANCE 57 avenue Carnot 94500 Champigny-sur-Marne / FR | [2020/16] |
Former [2019/38] | 01 /
COSTA DE BEAUREGARD, Pierre 6 rue Claude Matrat 92130 Issy Les Moulineaux / FR | ||
02 /
MARTY, Pascal 29 rue du Four 94360 Bry Sur Marne / FR | |||
03 /
MOREL, Thomas 23 rue Léo Lagrange 93160 Noisy Le Grand / FR | Representative(s) | Air Liquide L'Air Liquide S.A. Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/38] | Grout de Beaufort, François-Xavier L'Air Liquide Direction Propriété Intellectuelle 75, quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 17809335.7 | 14.11.2017 | [2019/38] | WO2017FR53100 | Priority number, date | FR20160060986 | 14.11.2016 Original published format: FR 1660986 | [2019/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018087496 | Date: | 17.05.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3538483 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3538483 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C01B3/38, F25J1/02, F25J1/00 | [2019/38] | CPC: |
C01B3/38 (EP,US);
F25J1/0022 (EP,US);
B01D53/0438 (US);
B01D53/1475 (US);
B01D53/1493 (US);
B01D53/75 (US);
B01D53/8606 (US);
C10L3/101 (US);
C10L3/103 (US);
F25J1/0229 (EP,US);
F25J1/0242 (EP,US);
B01D2252/204 (US);
B01D2253/116 (US);
B01D2256/24 (US);
B01D2257/304 (US);
B01D2257/504 (US);
B01D2257/80 (US);
B01D2259/40086 (US);
B01D2259/40088 (US);
C01B2203/0227 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0233 (US);
C01B2203/1241 (US);
C01B2203/1258 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1264 (EP,US);
C01B2203/80 (EP,US);
C10L2290/544 (US);
F25J2205/70 (EP,US);
F25J2220/64 (EP,US);
F25J2220/66 (EP,US);
F25J2220/68 (EP,US);
F25J2240/70 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYNTHESEGASERZEUGUNGSVERFAHREN ZUR IMPLEMENTIERUNG VON ERDGASVERFLÜSSIGUNG | [2019/38] | English: | SYNTHESIS GAS PRODUCTION PROCESS FOR THE IMPLEMENTATION OF A NATURAL GAS LIQUEFACTION | [2019/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE GAZ DE SYNTHÈSE POUR LA MISE EN UVRE D'UNE LIQUÉFACTION DE GAZ NATUREL | [2019/38] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/38] | 14.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.11.2017 | AL | 21.10.2020 | AT | 21.10.2020 | CY | 21.10.2020 | CZ | 21.10.2020 | DK | 21.10.2020 | EE | 21.10.2020 | ES | 21.10.2020 | FI | 21.10.2020 | HR | 21.10.2020 | IT | 21.10.2020 | LT | 21.10.2020 | LV | 21.10.2020 | MC | 21.10.2020 | MK | 21.10.2020 | MT | 21.10.2020 | NL | 21.10.2020 | PL | 21.10.2020 | RO | 21.10.2020 | RS | 21.10.2020 | SE | 21.10.2020 | SI | 21.10.2020 | SK | 21.10.2020 | SM | 21.10.2020 | TR | 21.10.2020 | IE | 14.11.2020 | LU | 14.11.2020 | BE | 30.11.2020 | CH | 30.11.2020 | LI | 30.11.2020 | BG | 21.01.2021 | NO | 21.01.2021 | GR | 22.01.2021 | IS | 21.02.2021 | PT | 22.02.2021 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 14.11.2017 | |
AL | 21.10.2020 | ||
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CY | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
MT | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
TR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IE | 14.11.2020 | ||
LU | 14.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
IE | 14.11.2020 | ||
LU | 14.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
IE | 14.11.2020 | ||
LU | 14.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
IE | 14.11.2020 | ||
LU | 14.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
IE | 14.11.2020 | ||
LU | 14.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
IE | 14.11.2020 | ||
LU | 14.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
LU | 14.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
LU | 14.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
LU | 14.11.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
LU | 14.11.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
LU | 14.11.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
LU | 14.11.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/30] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 21.10.2020 | |
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 21.10.2020 | |
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 21.10.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9836038 (NORSKE STATS OLJESELSKAP [NO], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2008079802 (CHEVRON USA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [A] - GEIJSEL J I ET AL, "SYNERGIES BETWEEN LNG AND GAS TO LIQUIDS CONVERSION//SYNERGIES ENTRE LE GNL ET LA CONVERSION DU GAZ EN LIQUIDES", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE AND EXHIBITION ON LIQUEFIED NATURAL GAS, XX, XX, (20010101), pages PS2 - 5.01, XP001146430 [A] 1-8 * section "Heat integration" * | [A] - SAWCHUK J ET AL, "ENHANCED PROCESS INTEGRATION BETWEEN LNG AND GTP PLANTS", vol. 14TH, (20060301), pages PO - 41/1, INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON LNG,, URL: http://www.kgu.or.kr/admin/data/P-000/8-PO-41-Sawchuk.pdf, (20170224), XP009108045 [A] 1-8 * section "PROCESS INTEGRATION BENEFITS" * | [A] - Peter Häussinger ET AL, "Hydrogen, 2. Production", Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, Weinheim, Germany, Wiley-VCH Verlag GmbH & Co. KGaA, (20111015), page 1,43,44,306, doi:10.1002/14356007.o13_o03, ISBN 978-3-52-730673-2, XP055097269 [A] 1-8 * page 260, section 1.3.2 "Tubular Reformer" * * page 267, section "Feed Preheating and Desulfurization" * * page 269, section 1.3.5 "Autothermal Reactors" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/14356007.o13_o03 |