EP3466717 - OMNI-DIRECTIONAL ROTATIONAL DRIVE MECHANISM AND MOVING BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tohoku University 2-1-1, Katahira Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | [2019/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TADAKUMA, Kenjiro c/o TOHOKU UNIVERSITY 2-1-1 Katahira Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | 02 /
TAKANE, Eri c/o TOHOKU UNIVERSITY 2-1-1 Katahira Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | 03 /
FUJITA, Masahiro c/o TOHOKU UNIVERSITY 2-1-1 Katahira Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | 04 /
KONYO, Masashi c/o TOHOKU UNIVERSITY 2-1-1 Katahira Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | 05 /
TADOKORO, Satoshi c/o TOHOKU UNIVERSITY 2-1-1 Katahira Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | [2019/19] |
Former [2019/15] | 01 /
TADAKUMA Kenjiro c/o TOHOKU UNIVERSITY 2-1-1 Katahira Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | ||
02 /
TAKANE Eri c/o TOHOKU UNIVERSITY 2-1-1 Katahira Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | |||
03 /
FUJITA Masahiro c/o TOHOKU UNIVERSITY 2-1-1 Katahira Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | |||
04 /
KONYO Masashi c/o TOHOKU UNIVERSITY 2-1-1 Katahira Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | |||
05 /
TADOKORO Satoshi c/o TOHOKU UNIVERSITY 2-1-1 Katahira Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [2019/15] | Application number, filing date | 17809937.0 | 31.03.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017JP13654 | Priority number, date | JP20160113392 | 07.06.2016 Original published format: JP 2016113392 | [2019/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017212754 | Date: | 14.12.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3466717 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3466717 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60B19/00, B60K7/00, F16H37/08, H02K7/116, H02K16/00, // B60B35/12, F16H1/22, H02K49/10 | [2020/37] | CPC: |
B60B19/003 (EP,US);
B60K7/0007 (EP,US);
F16H1/16 (US);
F16H1/20 (US);
F16H37/0806 (EP,US);
F16H49/00 (US);
H02K16/00 (EP,US);
H02K7/1166 (EP,US);
B60B35/124 (EP,US);
B60K2007/003 (EP,US);
B60K2007/0038 (EP,US);
B62K11/007 (EP,US);
F16H1/225 (EP,US);
H02K2213/06 (EP,US);
H02K2213/09 (EP,US);
H02K49/102 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/15] | B60B19/00, F16H1/16, F16H1/20, F16H49/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OMNIDIREKTIONALE DREHANTRIEBSMECHANISMUS UND BEWEGLICHER KÖRPER | [2019/15] | English: | OMNI-DIRECTIONAL ROTATIONAL DRIVE MECHANISM AND MOVING BODY | [2019/15] | French: | MÉCANISME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT EN ROTATION OMNIDIRECTIONNEL ET CORPS MOBILE | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2018 | Translation filed | 11.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 11.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 06.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.03.2017 | AL | 20.01.2021 | AT | 20.01.2021 | CY | 20.01.2021 | CZ | 20.01.2021 | DK | 20.01.2021 | EE | 20.01.2021 | ES | 20.01.2021 | FI | 20.01.2021 | HR | 20.01.2021 | IT | 20.01.2021 | LT | 20.01.2021 | LV | 20.01.2021 | MC | 20.01.2021 | MK | 20.01.2021 | MT | 20.01.2021 | NL | 20.01.2021 | PL | 20.01.2021 | RO | 20.01.2021 | RS | 20.01.2021 | SE | 20.01.2021 | SI | 20.01.2021 | SK | 20.01.2021 | SM | 20.01.2021 | BE | 31.03.2021 | CH | 31.03.2021 | IE | 31.03.2021 | LI | 31.03.2021 | LU | 31.03.2021 | BG | 20.04.2021 | NO | 20.04.2021 | GR | 21.04.2021 | IS | 20.05.2021 | PT | 20.05.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 31.03.2017 | |
AL | 20.01.2021 | ||
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CY | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
IT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
MK | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 31.03.2017 | |
AL | 20.01.2021 | ||
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CY | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
IT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CY | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
IT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
IT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
IT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
IT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 20.01.2021 | |
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 20.01.2021 | |
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 20.01.2021 | |
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2012012215 (TOYOTA ENG & MFG NORTH AMERICA [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0050]; figures 1A, 5; claim 1 *; | [XP] - HARUTO NOMURA ET AL, "Screw-shiki Sado Kaiten Kiko -Zenhoko Kudo Sharin to shiteno Gugenka", DAI 34 KAI ANNUAL CONFERENCE OF THE ROBOTICS SOCIETY OF JAPAN YOKOSHU DAI 34KAI NIHON ROBOTTO GAKKAI GAKUJUTSU KOENKAI$2016NEN 9GATSU 7KA (SUI)-9KA (KIN), YAMAGATA DAIGAKU KOSHIRA KAWA KYANPASU,, (20160907), pages 414 - 417, XP009511028 [XP] 1-6 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH07264838 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV) [A] 1-6* , & US 5633555 A & EP 669700 A1 & DE 4405701 A1 *; | [A]WO2010064408 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * , & JP 5443387 B2 & US 2011/0233989 A1 & DE 112009003512 T5 *; | [A]WO2015156263 (UNIV KYOTO [JP]) [A] 1-6 * , (Family: none) *; | [PX] - HARUTO NOMURA et al., "Screw-shiki Sado Kaiten Kiko -Zenhoko Kudo Sharin to shiteno Gugenka", Dai 34 Kai Annual Conference of the Robotics Society of Japan Yokoshu, (20160907), pages 414 - 417, XP009511028 [PX] 1-6 | [AP] - KENJIRO TADAKUMA et al., "Omnidirectional Wheel Mechanism with a Dual-Rings", The Proceedings of JSME annual Conference on Robotics and Mechatronics (Robomec), (20160608), pages 2559 - 2560, XP009511030 [AP] 1-6 |