Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020309063 | Global Dossier | 01.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017JP16744 | 27.04.2017 | JP2016115760 | 09.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6890548B | Global Dossier | 18.06.2021 | B2 | JPWO2017212826 | 04.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017JP16744 | 27.04.2017 | JP2016115760 | 09.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109196254 | Global Dossier | 11.01.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017JP16744 | 27.04.2017 | JP2016115760 | 09.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3470710 | Global Dossier | 30.09.2020 | B1 | EP3470710 | 08.01.2020 | A4 | EP3470710 | 17.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017JP16744 | 27.04.2017 | JP2016115760 | 09.06.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017212826 | Global Dossier | 14.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2016115760 | 09.06.2016 |