EP3469957 - ELBOW REST, UTENSIL COMPONENT, AND CHAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Okamura Corporation 7-18 Kitasaiwai 2-chome Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 220-0004 / JP | [2019/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAGI, Yuuichirou c/o Okamura Corporation 7-18 Kitasaiwai 2-chome Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 220-0004 / JP | 02 /
MASUNAGA, Hiroshi c/o Okamura Corporation 7-18 Kitasaiwai 2-chome Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 220-0004 / JP | 03 /
IGARASHI, Ryo c/o Okamura Corporation 7-18 Kitasaiwai 2-chome Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 220-0004 / JP | 04 /
IZAWA, Syouichi c/o Okamura Corporation 7-18 Kitasaiwai 2-chome Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 220-0004 / JP | [2019/16] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Laurent & Charras Le Contemporain 50 Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cedex / FR | [2019/16] | Application number, filing date | 17810425.3 | 09.06.2017 | [2019/16] | WO2017JP21475 | Priority number, date | JP20160116566 | 10.06.2016 Original published format: JP 2016116566 | JP20160116567 | 10.06.2016 Original published format: JP 2016116567 | JP20160116568 | 10.06.2016 Original published format: JP 2016116568 | [2019/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017213253 | Date: | 14.12.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3469957 | Date: | 17.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A47C7/54, A47C1/03 | [2020/01] | CPC: |
A47C1/0307 (EP,US);
A47C1/0305 (EP);
A47C1/0308 (EP);
A47C7/54 (US);
A47C7/541 (US);
F16C11/12 (US);
F16H19/0645 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/16] | A47C7/54 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/16] | Title | German: | ELLBOGENSTÜTZE, UTENSILIENKOMPONENTE UND STUHL | [2019/16] | English: | ELBOW REST, UTENSIL COMPONENT, AND CHAIR | [2019/16] | French: | ACCOUDOIR, ÉLÉMENT D'USTENSILE, ET CHAISE | [2019/16] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2019 | Translation filed | 04.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 04.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/16] | 26.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/30] | 26.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5380065 (ROHRER DANIEL F [US]) [X] 1,2,4,10 * column 2, lines 39-44; figure - *; | [XA]US2004017102 (IGARASHI RYO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,10 * figures 1-3,11 * [A] 4-9,11-15; | [X]JP2013233166 (OKAMURA CORP) [X] 1-3,10* figures 1-16 * | International search | [A]JP2001211962 (ITOKI CREBIO CORP) [A] 1-16 * , (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2004049692 (OKAMURA CORP) [A] 1-16 * , & US 2004/0017102 A1 & US 2006/0238009 A1 & US 2006/0244295 A1 & WO 2004/008915 A1 & EP 1527714 A1 & DE 60324941 D & CA 2435782 A & KR 10-2005-0028046 A & CN 1671317 A & AU 2003281505 A & CA 2435782 A1 *; | [A]JP2004113501 (OKAMURA CORP) [A] 1-16* , & US 2004/0017102 A1 & US 2006/0238009 A1 & US 2006/0244295 A1 & WO 2004/008915 A1 & EP 1527714 A1 & DE 60324941 D & CA 2435782 A & KR 10-2005-0028046 A & CN 1671317 A & AU 2003281505 A & CA 2435782 A1 *; | [A]JP2014083103 (OKAMURA CORP) [A] 1-16 * , (Family: none) * |