18.03.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.02.2024 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
11.07.2023 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
21.03.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.10.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.06.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.06.2022 |
First examination report |
|
23.03.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.04.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.05.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.03.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.01.2020 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
24.01.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
24.01.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
16.08.2019 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] |
16.08.2019 |
Change - extension states |
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] |
10.04.2019 |
Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
10.04.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.03.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.04.2019 [2019/16] |
15.03.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
15.03.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.04.2019 [2019/16] |
19.02.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.12.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
17.12.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.12.2018 |
New entry: Observations by third parties |
|
12.12.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.11.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.11.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
20.11.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
20.11.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.12.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.12.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|