Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6841909B | Global Dossier | 10.03.2021 | B2 | JP2019521054 | 25.07.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201615177960 | 09.06.2016 | WO2017US27122 | 12.04.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109415165B | Global Dossier | 01.05.2020 | B | CN109415165 | 01.03.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201615177960 | 09.06.2016 | WO2017US27122 | 12.04.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3468901 | Global Dossier | 26.02.2020 | A4 | EP3468901 | 17.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615177960 | 09.06.2016 | WO2017US27122 | 12.04.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112018075218 | 21.09.2021 | B1 | BR112018075218 | 19.03.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201615177960 | 09.06.2016 | WO2017US27122 | 12.04.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017213744 | Global Dossier | 14.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615177960 | 09.06.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9771220 | Global Dossier | 26.09.2017 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201615177960 | 09.06.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7101277B | Global Dossier | 14.07.2022 | B2 | JP2021066608 | 30.04.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201615177960 | 09.06.2016 |