EP3550972 - TREATMENT FOR REMOVING ECTOPARASITES FROM FISH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Benchmark Animal Health Limited Highdown House Yeoman Way Worthing West Sussex BN99 3HH / GB | [2023/03] |
Former [2023/01] | For all designated states Benchmark Animal Health Limited Benchmark House 8 Smithy Wood Drive Sheffield S35 1QN / GB | ||
Former [2019/42] | For all designated states Benchmark Animal Health Limited Benchmark House 8 Smithy Wood Drive Sheffield S35 1QN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARSHALL, John The Old Mill House Dunsbridge Turnpike Shepreth Royston SG8 6RA / GB | 02 /
LONGSHAW, Matthew 12 Southwell Street Portland DT5 2DP / GB | 03 /
APPLEYARD, Elizabeth Flat 5 Briery Busk Farm Nine Acre Lane Sheffield S36 2AS / GB | [2019/42] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/01] | Mitchell, Simon James Murgitroyd & Company London Euston House 24 Eversholt Street London NW1 1AD / GB | ||
Former [2019/42] | Mitchell, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Euston House 24 Eversholt Street London NW1 1AD / GB | Application number, filing date | 17811302.3 | 07.12.2017 | [2019/42] | WO2017EP81924 | Priority number, date | NO20160001951 | 08.12.2016 Original published format: NO 20161951 | [2019/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018104487 | Date: | 14.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3550972 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3550972 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A01N37/18, A01N43/40, A01N43/86, A01N47/40, A01N51/00, A01P7/04 | [2019/42] | CPC: |
A01N51/00 (EP,DK,NO,US);
A01N43/40 (EP,DK,NO,US);
A01N37/18 (EP,DK,US);
A01N43/86 (EP,DK,US);
A01N47/40 (EP,DK,NO,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON EKTOPARASITEN AUS FISCH | [2019/42] | English: | TREATMENT FOR REMOVING ECTOPARASITES FROM FISH | [2019/42] | French: | TRAITEMENT D'ÉLIMINATION D'ECTOPARASITES DES POISSONS | [2019/42] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/42] | 28.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23150218.8 / EP4186366 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/50] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.05.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 12.05.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.05.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.01.2023 | CZ | 04.01.2023 | EE | 04.01.2023 | HR | 04.01.2023 | LT | 04.01.2023 | LV | 04.01.2023 | RO | 04.01.2023 | RS | 04.01.2023 | SI | 04.01.2023 | SK | 04.01.2023 | SM | 04.01.2023 | PT | 04.05.2023 | [2024/11] |
Former [2023/50] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 04.01.2023 | |
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 04.01.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2015272931 (BOUVIER JACQUES [CH], et al) [X] 1,4,8-10,14,15,17,25,28,32-34,39,40 * paragraphs [0006] , [0009] - [0025]; example 1; claim -; tables 1,2 * [Y] 1-40; | [Y]WO2015198247 (O'HALLORAN JOHN [CA], et al) [Y] 1-40* paragraphs [0039] - [0052]; example -; claim - * | by applicant | EP0590425 | WO2009010755 | WO2010109187 |