EP3529301 - FIBER-REINFORCED ORGANIC POLYMER AEROGEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blueshift Materials, Inc. 3055 Hunter Road San Marcos, Texas 78666 / US | [2019/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Liu c/o Blueshift Materials, Inc. 3055 Hunter Road San Marcos, Texas 78666 / US | 02 /
FLETCHER, Ashleigh c/o Blueshift Materials, Inc. 3055 Hunter Road San Marcos, Texas 78666 / US | 03 /
TAYLOR, Stewart c/o Blueshift Materials, Inc. 3055 Hunter Road San Marcos, Texas 78666 / US | 04 /
SILLARS, Fiona c/o Blueshift Materials, Inc. 3055 Hunter Road San Marcos, Texas 78666 / US | 05 /
NASH, David c/o Blueshift Materials, Inc. 3055 Hunter Road San Marcos, Texas 78666 / US | 06 /
WEBLEY, Andrew c/o Blueshift Materials, Inc. 3055 Hunter Road San Marcos, Texas 78666 / US | 07 /
POE, Garrett c/o Blueshift Materials, Inc. 3055 Hunter Road San Marcos, Texas 78666 / US | [2023/48] |
Former [2019/35] | 01 /
YANG, Liu c/o Blueshift Materials, Inc. 3055 Hunter Road San Marcos, Texas 78666 / US | ||
02 /
FLETCHER, Ashleigh c/o Blueshift Materials, Inc. 3055 Hunter Road San Marcos, Texas 78666 / US | |||
03 /
TAYLOR, Stewart c/o Blueshift Materials, Inc. 3055 Hunter Road San Marcos, Texas 78666 / US | |||
04 /
SILLARS, Fiona c/o Blueshift Materials, Inc. 3055 Hunter Road San Marcos, Texas 78666 / US | |||
05 /
NASH, David c/o Blueshift Materials, Inc. 3055 Hunter Road San Marcos, Texas 78666 / US | |||
06 /
WEBLEY, Andrew c/o Blueshift Materials, Inc. 3055 Hunter Road San Marcos, Texas 78666 / US | |||
07 /
POE, Garrett c/o Blueshift Materials, Inc. 3055 Hunter Road San Marcos, Texas 78666 / US | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [2019/35] | Application number, filing date | 17811698.4 | 23.10.2017 | [2019/35] | WO2017IB56575 | Priority number, date | US201662412145P | 24.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662412145 P | [2019/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018078512 | Date: | 03.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3529301 | Date: | 28.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3529301 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/04, C08J9/28, B01J13/00 | [2019/35] | CPC: |
C08J5/04 (EP,US);
C08J9/0085 (EP,US);
B01J13/0091 (EP,US);
C08J5/043 (US);
C08J5/046 (US);
C08J5/24 (US);
C08J9/0061 (EP);
C08J9/286 (EP,US);
C08L61/12 (US);
C08L79/08 (US);
F16L59/028 (US);
C08J2201/05 (EP);
C08J2201/0504 (US);
C08J2205/026 (EP,US);
C08J2205/042 (US);
C08J2205/044 (US);
C08J2205/048 (EP,US);
C08J2300/12 (EP);
C08J2361/10 (EP);
C08J2361/12 (EP,US);
C08J2379/08 (EP,US);
C08J2429/04 (US);
C08J2467/00 (EP,US);
C08L2203/14 (US);
C08L2205/16 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FASERVERSTÄRKTES ORGANISCHES POLYMER-AEROGEL | [2019/35] | English: | FIBER-REINFORCED ORGANIC POLYMER AEROGEL | [2019/35] | French: | AÉROGEL POLYMÈRE ORGANIQUE RENFORCÉ PAR DES FIBRES | [2019/35] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/35] | 20.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.11.2023 | CZ | 29.11.2023 | DK | 29.11.2023 | EE | 29.11.2023 | ES | 29.11.2023 | HR | 29.11.2023 | IT | 29.11.2023 | LT | 29.11.2023 | LV | 29.11.2023 | NL | 29.11.2023 | PL | 29.11.2023 | RO | 29.11.2023 | RS | 29.11.2023 | SE | 29.11.2023 | SK | 29.11.2023 | SM | 29.11.2023 | BG | 29.02.2024 | NO | 29.02.2024 | GR | 01.03.2024 | IS | 29.03.2024 | PT | 01.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 29.11.2023 | |
CZ | 29.11.2023 | ||
DK | 29.11.2023 | ||
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RO | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | DK | 29.11.2023 | |
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 29.11.2023 | |
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 29.11.2023 | |
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 01.03.2024 | |
IS | 29.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE10300979 (DEUTSCH ZENTR LUFT & RAUMFAHRT [DE]); | [A]DE102004047552 (DEUTSCH ZENTR LUFT & RAUMFAHRT [DE]); | [A]US2010204347 (PARK SANG-HO [KR], et al); | [Y]DE102012218548 (DEUTSCH ZENTR LUFT & RAUMFAHRT [DE]); | [A]US2014148560 (QURESHI SHAHID P [US], et al); | [A]EP3053952 (EIDGENÖSSISCHE MATERIALPRÜFUNGS UND FORSCHUNGSANSTALT EMPA [CH]) | by applicant | US5705535 | US2002094426 | US8214980 | US8637582 | US2015017860 | US9434832 |