EP3539011 - CONTROL APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING DATA INPUTS IN COMPUTING DEVICES THEREFORE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRECISIONLIFE LTD. Unit 8b Bankside Hanborough Business Park Long Hanborough Witney Oxon, OX29 8LJ / GB | [2020/07] |
Former [2019/46] | For all designated states Rowanalytics Ltd C9 Glyme Court Langford Lane Kidlington OX5 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [2019/38] | For all designated states Rowanalytics Ltd Workspace Oxford 3 King's Meadow Oxford OX2 0DP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARDNER, Stephen Philip C9 Glyme Court Langford Lane Kidlington OX5 1LQ / GB | 02 /
SØRENSEN MOLLER, Gert Lykke Agern Alle 3 DK-2970 Horsholm / DK | [2019/38] | Representative(s) | Norris, Timothy Sweyn Basck 50 - 60 Station Road Cambridge CB1 2JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/38] | Norris, Timothy Sweyn Basck 16 Saxon Road Cambridge CB5 8HS / GB | Application number, filing date | 17811851.9 | 10.11.2017 | [2019/38] | WO2017EP25333 | Priority number, date | GB20160019039 | 10.11.2016 Original published format: GB 201619039 | US201662420491P | 10.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662420491 P | GB20170007588 | 11.05.2017 Original published format: GB 201707588 | US201762504655P | 11.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762504655 P | [2019/41] |
Former [2019/38] | GB20160019039 | 10.11.2016 | |
US201662420491P | 11.11.2016 | ||
GB20170007588 | 11.05.2017 | ||
US201762504655P | 11.05.2017 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018086761 | Date: | 17.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3539011 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/11, G06N5/04 | [2019/38] | CPC: |
G06F17/11 (EP,US);
G05B17/02 (US);
G06F16/245 (US);
G06F30/23 (US);
G06N5/04 (EP,US);
G16H10/60 (EP,US);
G16H20/40 (US);
G16H20/60 (EP,US);
G16H40/63 (EP,US);
G16H50/20 (EP,US);
G16H50/50 (EP,US);
G16H70/40 (EP,US);
Y02A90/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/38] | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON DATENEINGABEN IN COMPUTING-VORRICHTUNGEN DAFÜR | [2019/38] | English: | CONTROL APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING DATA INPUTS IN COMPUTING DEVICES THEREFORE | [2019/38] | French: | APPAREIL DE COMMANDE ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'ENTRÉES DE DONNÉES DANS DES DISPOSITIFS INFORMATIQUES S'Y RAPPORTANT | [2019/38] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/38] | 07.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.02.2022 | 15.02.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/26] | 24.02.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 25.02.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2014142777 (NOVIKOV ANATOLIY ANATOLIEVICH [UA]) [A] 1-22 * abstract *; | [A]WO2015148599 (GILLESPIE CLAYTON [US]) [A] 1-22 * abstract * |