EP3532190 - CATALYTIC WALL-FLOW FILTER WITH PARTIAL SURFACE COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson Matthey Public Limited Company 5th Floor 25, Farringdon Street London EC4A 4AB / GB | [2019/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANDLER, Guy c/o Johnson Matthey Orchard Road Royston SG8 5HE / GB | 02 /
FLANAGAN, Keith c/o Johnson Matthey Orchard Road Royston SG8 5HE / GB | 03 /
PHILLIPS, Paul c/o Johnson Matthey Orchard Road Royston SG8 5HE / GB | 04 /
MARVELL, David c/o Johnson Matthey Orchard Road Royston SG8 5HE / GB | [2019/36] | Representative(s) | Johnson Matthey Plc Intellectual Property Department Belasis Avenue Billingham TS23 1LB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/49] | Bown, Mark Richard Johnson Matthey PLC Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 1 Belasis Avenue Billingham, Cleveland TS23 1LB / GB | ||
Former [2019/36] | Lenden, Philip Johnson Matthey PLC Gate 20 Orchard Road Royston, Herts. SG8 5HE / GB | Application number, filing date | 17812043.2 | 26.10.2017 | [2019/36] | WO2017IB56650 | Priority number, date | US201662414301P | 28.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662414301 P | [2019/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018078559 | Date: | 03.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3532190 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3532190 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/94, F01N3/035, F01N3/20 | [2020/49] | CPC: |
F01N3/035 (EP,GB,RU,US);
B01D53/9463 (GB);
B01D53/86 (GB);
B01D53/94 (RU);
B01D53/9418 (EP,US);
B01D53/944 (US);
B01D53/9468 (GB);
B01D53/9472 (EP,GB,US);
F01N3/2066 (EP,GB,US);
B01D2255/2065 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20776 (EP,US);
B01D2255/50 (EP,US);
B01D2255/9022 (GB);
B01D2255/9032 (GB);
B01D2255/9155 (EP,US);
B01J23/56 (US);
B01J37/0246 (US);
F01N2330/02 (EP,US);
F01N2330/06 (EP,US);
F01N2330/60 (EP,US);
F01N2370/04 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/36] | B01D53/94, F01N3/035 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/48] |
Former [2019/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KATALYTISCHER WANDSTRÖMUNGSFILTER MIT PARTIELLER OBERFLÄCHENBESCHICHTUNG | [2019/36] | English: | CATALYTIC WALL-FLOW FILTER WITH PARTIAL SURFACE COATING | [2019/36] | French: | FILTRE À ÉCOULEMENT MURAL CATALYTIQUE AVEC REVÊTEMENT DE SURFACE PARTIEL | [2019/36] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/36] | 28.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 30.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 02.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.12.2023 | CZ | 06.12.2023 | EE | 06.12.2023 | ES | 06.12.2023 | HR | 06.12.2023 | IT | 06.12.2023 | LT | 06.12.2023 | LV | 06.12.2023 | NL | 06.12.2023 | PL | 06.12.2023 | RO | 06.12.2023 | RS | 06.12.2023 | SE | 06.12.2023 | SK | 06.12.2023 | SM | 06.12.2023 | BG | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.03.2024 | GR | 07.03.2024 | IS | 06.04.2024 | PT | 08.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 06.12.2023 | |
CZ | 06.12.2023 | ||
EE | 06.12.2023 | ||
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RO | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 06.12.2023 | |
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 06.12.2023 | |
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 07.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE102008055890 (SUED CHEMIE AG [DE]) [X] 1,4,8,16-19,21,22 * paragraphs [0026] , [0027] , [0029] , [0032] , [0035] , [0039] , [0041] , [0052] , [0055] , [0056] - [0058] ** figure 2 *; | [XI]EP2275194 (UMICORE AG & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-3,8,12,16-19 * paragraphs [0001] , [0017] , [0018] , [0023] , [0026] , [0027] , [0029] * * figure 1c * [I] 4,5; | [XI]US2011078997 (BOORSE R SAMUEL [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8,12-14,16-22 * paragraphs [0015] - [0019] - [0023] , [0036] - [0038] - [0051] , [0052] , [0054] * * figure 3 * [I] 6; | [X]EP2322773 (UMICORE AG & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-5,7,16-22 * paragraphs [0022] , [0028] - [0030] - [0035] - [0038] - [0041] * * figure 8 * * example 2 *; | [XI]DE102014117672 (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB]) [X] 1-3,6-22 * paragraphs [0001] , [0026] , [0040] - [0042] - [0050] , [0054] - [0057] - [0 86] , [0 87] * * table 2 * [I] 4,5 | by applicant | WO9947260 | WO2005016497 | WO2005030365 | WO2008106519 | WO2008132452 | WO2009001131 | WO2010043891 | WO2011064666 | WO2011080525 | US2012247092 | US8398925 | US8617476 | US2014140899 | WO2014195685 |