EP3358638 - ORGANIC SOLAR CELL AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kolon Industries, Inc. 110, Magokdong-ro Gangseo-gu Seoul 07793 / KR | [2019/22] |
Former [2018/32] | For all designated states Kolon Industries, Inc. 11, Kolon-ro Gwacheon-si, Gyeonggi-do 13837 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHO, Geun Sang 30, Mabuk-ro 154beon-gil Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 16910 / KR | 02 /
KU, Ja-Ram 30, Mabuk-ro 154beon-gil Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 16910 / KR | 03 /
MOON, Jeong Yeol 30, Mabuk-ro 154beon-gil Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 16910 / KR | 04 /
PARK, Hong Kwan 30, Mabuk-ro 154beon-gil Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 16910 / KR | 05 /
CHOI, Yoon Young 30, Mabuk-ro 154beon-gil Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 16910 / KR | [2018/32] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2018/32] | Application number, filing date | 17813551.3 | 13.06.2017 | [2018/32] | WO2017KR06119 | Priority number, date | KR20160074401 | 15.06.2016 Original published format: KR 20160074401 | KR20160078484 | 23.06.2016 Original published format: KR 20160078484 | [2018/32] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017217727 | Date: | 21.12.2017 | Language: | KO | [2017/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3358638 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/44, H01L51/42 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
H10K30/82 (EP);
H10K2102/103 (EP);
H10K30/152 (EP);
H10K30/50 (EP);
H10K85/1135 (EP);
Y02E10/549 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/32] | H01L51/44, H01L51/00, H01L51/42, C08L65/00, C08L25/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] | Title | German: | ORGANISCHE SOLARZELLE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2018/32] | English: | ORGANIC SOLAR CELL AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2018/32] | French: | CELLULE SOLAIRE ORGANIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2018/32] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2018 | Translation filed | 04.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2018 | Search fee paid | 04.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/32] | 04.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]WO2014007867 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]); | [XA]DE102014107658 (OSRAM OPTO SEMICONDUCTORS GMBH [DE]); | International search | [A]WO2004021463 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]); | [A]KR20110041312 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al); | [A]US2012111403 (AHN TAE HWAN [KR], et al); | [Y]KR20130107036 (POSCO [KR]); | [YA]KR20140115515 (UNIV KYUNG HEE UNIV IND COOP GROUP [KR]) |