Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10793384 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2020 | B2 | US2019315587 | 17.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2016123429 | 22.06.2016 | WO2017JP21480 | 09.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6692425B | Global Dossier | 13.05.2020 | B2 | JPWO2017221747 | 22.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2016123429 | 22.06.2016 | WO2017JP21480 | 09.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109641709B | Global Dossier | 11.08.2020 | B | CN109641709 | 16.04.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2016123429 | 22.06.2016 | WO2017JP21480 | 09.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3473570 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2022 | B1 | EP3473570 | 08.04.2020 | A4 | EP3473570 | 24.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2016123429 | 22.06.2016 | WO2017JP21480 | 09.06.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017221747 | Global Dossier | 28.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2016123429 | 22.06.2016 |